Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with DeMelo, J presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2004 |
CategoryFamily Support |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions158 days |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By Mail
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order or Judgment
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Modification: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Continuation
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Modification: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: DeMelo, J.F., Jr. |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Request for Telephonic Appearance | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Response to Governmental Notice of Motion | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Telephone Appearance (Governmental) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.