We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schools Financial Credit Union ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Limited
case
against
Casillas, Gloria Jean ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Judge
Shelleyanne W. L. Chang
Filing Date
February 16, 2010
Last Refreshed
December 02, 2021
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Plaintiffs
Schools Financial Credit Union
Case Events for
Schools Financial Credit Union v. Casillas, Gloria Jean
Date
Type
Description
April 23, 2010
Docket Event
Casillas, Gloria Jean added as a Defendant effective 12/22/2009 .
April 23, 2010
Docket Event
Schools Financial Credit Union added as a Plaintiff effective 12/22/2009 .
February 16, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Get Document
December 22, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
September 01, 2006
Hearing
Motion - Other - Civil Trial Heard
March 20, 2006
Hearing
Order of Examination - OX Calendar Heard
December 28, 2005
Hearing
Order of Examination - OX Calendar Heard
August 02, 2005
Hearing
Order of Examination - OX Calendar Heard
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.