Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jamie A Forbes, against Lunsford, Angela, Martin Jr, Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2011-08-16T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2011-08-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2013-10-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: October 27, 2015Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: April 22, 2015Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: May 08, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: July 20, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 14, 2016Notice of Renewal of Judgment (return) filed.
Date: April 22, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 10, 2016Writ of Execution Issued
Date: June 16, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.