Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gcfs Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brighton Hushing-Kline, against Aguirre, Alejandra, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: October 20, 2014Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2009-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: October 20, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2014-10-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: January 03, 2017Writ of Execution (Solano) Issued
Date: April 11, 2018Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 22, 2019Writ of Execution (SOLANO) Issued
Date: April 27, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.