Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Donald J. Currier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: April 29, 2015Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: April 24, 2018Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Worldwide Asset Purchasing LLC rejected on 01/02/2014 .
Date: 2014-01-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Orange) Issued
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 03, 2017Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Return) filed.
Date: June 10, 2015Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: September 25, 2017Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: June 10, 2015Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: October 06, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: February 06, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.