Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Carlos H. Tello filed a(n) Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Hanford - Family.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2004 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseHanford - Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion for Modification: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: J.F. Demelo |
|
July 05, 2018 | Action |
Notice of Motion (Governmental) (Modification, Child Support, Health Care.Hearing set for 8/28/2018 at 8:15 am in Dept 3) |
|
December 02, 2008 | Action |
Proof of Service by Mail: 0013) For Hector Tello on 12/01/08 stip and order filed on 11/18/08 (AH)
Judge: J.F. Demelo |
|
December 02, 2008 | Action |
Proof of Service by Mail: 0014) For Lorena Tello on 12/01/08 stipulation and order filed on 11/18/08 (AH)
Judge: J.F. Demelo |
|
November 18, 2008 | Action |
Stipulation for the Appointment of Stipulation-Accept Com. DeMelo: 0010) signed by all parties (JA) |
|
November 18, 2008 | Action |
Minute Order - Granting: 0011) Re: motion modification of child support and health care. DCSS tenders stipulation and order. Court approves and signs stipulation and order. (JA)
Judge: J.F. Demelo |
|
November 18, 2008 | Action |
Stipulation and Order (after 7/1/97) Stip & Order (after 7/1/97): 0012) respondent pay $654 commencing 11/1/08, provide and maintain health insurance coverage and equally share uncovered health care expenses. filed and entered (JA) Judge: J.F. Demelo |
|
November 18, 2008 | Hearing |
Motion for Modification: Child Support and Health Care
Judge: J.F. Demelo |
|
October 20, 2008 | Action |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order Resp Decl to Req for Order: 0009) For hearing date of 11/18/08 on cal @08:45a.m in D-10 filed by Lorena Tello with an invalid proof of service on back (AH) |
|
September 30, 2008 | Action |
Notice of Motion (Governmental) Notice of Motion-Governmental: 0008) Modification of Child Support and Health Care - filed by Department of Child Support Services and set for Hector Tello to appear on 11-18-08 at 8:45am in Dept. 10 (CC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.