Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
James Hendricks & Associates Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hrdlicka, Steven R., against Kirkpatrick, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Carlos A. Cabrera presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed | |
July 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Settled Case Status Conference
Judge: Cardoza, Jane |
|
October 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
October 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Off calendar Hearing date of 21-Oct-04 taken OFF calendar - Dismissed |
|
February 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: Corona, Adolfo |
|
February 11, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 11-FEB-2004 by EFE1959. |
|
February 10, 2004 | Docket Event | Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 2/26/04, that this case should be designated as a settled case and set for settled case status conference on July 15, 2005. jw | |
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Judge C. Cabrera for clarification on the date for the settled case status conference. jw | |
February 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order signed by Judge Carlos A. Cabrera filed. It is hereby ordered that this action should not be dismissed. It is further ordered, that this case should be designated as a settled case and set for settled case status conference on July 15, 2005. jw |
|
February 05, 2004 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of Steven R. Hrdlicka re: Dismissal Hearing filed. jw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.