Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kanagawa, Reiko, Kanagawa, Robert, filed a(n) 16 Unlimited - Fraud case represented by Murillo, Joel M., against Basmajian, Pamela, Basmajian, Richard, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Snauffer, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2003 |
Category16 Unlimited - Fraud |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of change of address of Joel M. Murillo . le | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CVCE174381. |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. dhouston (fees only for nsf) | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Payment received on ret. check Payment received on returned check in the amount of $ 70.00. dhouston |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of bad check filed Notice of check returned without payment filed. The Law Offices of Joel Murello owes $25.00 + $45.00 bad check charge. Date of mailing 1/23/13. Last day to pay is 2/19/13. kan |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment cancelled NSF deft not NSF VOID FOR RECEIPT #CVCE172075 $25.00 FOR FILING. LP |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Void Payment Receipt Number CVCE172075 has been voided. |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CVCE172075. |
|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued. le | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case returned to the warehouse sg |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.