Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc, As Assignee Of Cavalry Spv Ii, Llc, As Assignee Of Conseco, As Assignee Of Gt Mastercard, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Naomi Brickey, against Poor, Anne A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2004 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Declaration of Brian N. Winn in Support of Judgment CCP 1033
Date: 2004-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-12-28T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: November 04, 2013Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: November 04, 2013Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2009-12-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default
Date: 2004-02-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: February 18, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: September 30, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2010-02-02T00:00:00Declaration RE: Underlying Action of Open Book Account
Date: 2004-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment (returned) filed.
Date: December 06, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 10, 2010Declaration RE Waiver of Attorney Fees
Date: 2004-02-18T00:00:00WRIT of Execution - Issued - County of Sacramento
Date: 2006-05-09T00:00:00Declaration RE: Interest
Date: 2004-02-18T00:00:00Summons with Proof of Service
Date: 2004-01-14T00:00:00WRIT of Execution - Issued - County of Sacramento
Date: 2007-08-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Issued
Date: 2004-08-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.