Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Government Employees Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Brian D Richardson, Steven J Horn, against Williams, Angela Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2004 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 23, 2014Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2008-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 31, 2014Declaration - Other (Interest) filed.
Date: May 23, 2014Proof of Service filed.
Date: June 23, 2014Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 18, 2014Returned Document - Writ of Execution
Date: 2008-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Return) filed.
Date: June 23, 2014Writ of Execution (Issued - Alameda)
Date: 2008-09-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO) Issued
Date: September 04, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.