Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gcfs Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brighton Hushing-Kline, against Smith, Darrell Lovell, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kenneth N. Brody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Issued) filed.
Date: July 11, 2011Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: August 22, 2011Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: January 04, 2021Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: July 11, 2011Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2009-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 22, 2011Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2007-12-14T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2008-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.