We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Merchants Acceptance Inc ,
filed a(n)
Civil - Limited
case
represented by
Rory W Clark ,
against
Camacho, Alberto G. ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
with Timothy M. Frawley presiding.
Filing Date
December 16, 2004
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Case Events for
Merchants Acceptance Inc v. Camacho, Alberto G.
Date
Type
Description
December 02, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
September 28, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Get Document
September 09, 2009
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
November 12, 2008
Docket Event
Clark, Rory W added as a effective 09/15/2003 .
November 12, 2008
Docket Event
Camacho, Alberto G added as a Defendant effective 09/15/2003 .
November 12, 2008
Docket Event
Merchants Acceptance Inc added as a Plaintiff effective 09/15/2003 .
November 12, 2008
Docket Event
Writ of Execution (Tulare) Issued
Get Document
July 25, 2008
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
April 28, 2005
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard
March 03, 2005
Hearing
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.