Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
City Of Clovis, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Mangini, John A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Mark W. Snauffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark W. Snauffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 1988 |
Category14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Substitution of attorney filed Substitution of attorneys filed. Old atty: Leland D. Stephenson New atty: John A. Mangini gs |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order filed Order for disbursement of funds deposited with Court signed by Judge Mark W. Snauffer filed. ks |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order: Disbursement of Funds Forwarded to: 501 ms Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing 3/9/15 lmw |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-MAR-2015 by LWHIPPLE. |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 05-MAR-2015 by LWHIPPLE. |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute order - Judge Snauffer Minute Order from Dept.: 501 Clerk: L. Whipple Reporter: N/R Nature of Hearing:General Motion Tentative ruling becomes the order of the court. No further order is necessary. Pursuant to CRC 391(a) and CCP section 1019.5(a), no further order is necessary. The minute order adopting the tentative ruling serves as the order of the court. Service by the clerk will constitute notice of the order. See attached copy of Tentative Ruling. To grant. The funds deposited with this Court on March 30, 1989, by plaintiff City of Clovis in the amount of $26,750.00 together with all accrued interest thereon shall be paid to the City of Clovis. lmw NOTE: Certified copy of minute order and tentative ruling given to Fiscal on 3/9/2015. sef |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
General Motion John A Mangini per Donna 650-876-0188 disbursment of funds cont per atty from 1/29 dhouston check sg Judge: Snauffer, Mark |
|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Points and authorities filed in support of Petition for order for disbursement of funds deposited with court. forwarded to R/A le Event: Points and authorities filed |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service filed. sg |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Kept File Case file kept at Law & Motion Desk for 3-5-15 hearing sg |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.