Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pena, Guadalupe, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Arax, Brian M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArax, Brian M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 1984 |
CategoryConservatorship - Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Probate Status Hearing Re: Filing of the Seventeenth Account Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Minute Order and Examiner Notes dated 8/30/2022) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on (8/30/2022) . Parties served: (Susan L. Pascuzzi) tca 8/30/2022 |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Seventeenth Account
Judge: Cardoza, Jane |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigator Review Report Fee waived |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Increased Bond Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Bond Filed Rider Increasing Bond - Amount: $63,000.00 to $87,000.00 |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the Increased Bond
Judge: Arax, Brian M |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Sixteenth Account and Report of Successor Co-Conservators; Petition for Allowance of Fees to Conservator and Attorney Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Filed Zoom Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.