Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
North American Mortgage Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Larsen, Mary, Larsen, H Thorstein, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Suits, Martin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2001 |
Category32 Limited - Residential Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed | |
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Dismissal
Judge: Suits, Martin |
|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 2-17-06 . dismissal entered mmr | |
December 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mmr Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
November 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 29-NOV-2005 by TCOHAN. |
|
January 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
Dec/order posting of summons Declaration of plaintiff filed. Application and order for posting of summons signed by Judge Aaron on 1/11/02 . |
|
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$96.00 was made on receipt CLCE16101. |
|
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.