Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ALBERT RAMIREZ VS. VALERY DEL CARMEN MIRANDA
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Ramirez Albert, against Miranda Valery Del Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Glenda Veasey presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 08, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- Sent to Dept J for a signature on ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (Amended ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- Rejected on ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Off Calendar - No Appearance Short Cause Trial - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Veasey Glenda |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Glenda |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Judge: Veasey Glenda |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Judge: Glenda |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Judge: Veasey Glenda |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order (- Status Conference ) | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order (- Status Conference ) | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued Judge: Glenda |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (in support of trial brief ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Separate Property Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration (in support of trial brief ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Filed by Respondent |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Separate Property Filed by Respondent |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address Filed by Respondent |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- FAULTY (parties name are missing) ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Trial Date Set Trial Setting Conference - Held - Trial Date Set Judge: Veasey Glenda |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Status Conference ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Status Conference ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Trial Date Set Judge: Glenda |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request - Trial Setting ((petnr) time est. 1 hour ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request - Trial Setting ((petnr) time est. 1 hour ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Trial Setting Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Veasey Glenda |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-28 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-28 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-28 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Glenda |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Filed and Entered on 2016-12-28 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Trial Setting Conference (- Hearing Set on 2016-12-28 ) | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Trial Setting Conference (- Hearing Set on 2016-12-28 ) | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-07 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Request - Trial Setting ((resp) time est. 1 hr - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-07 ) | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Request - Trial Setting ((resp) time est. 1 hr - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-07 ) | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-07 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-22-16 ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-22-16 ) | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion (resp OCF - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-15 ) | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Off Calendar - Case Settled Order to Show Cause Hearing - Off Calendar - Case Settled Judge: Veasey Glenda |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreement - Conciliation Court (- Signed on 2015-07-15 ) | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion (petit OCF - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-15 ) | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreement - Conciliation Court (- Signed on 2015-07-15 ) | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Torrance Dept. - J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding Order to Show Cause Hearing - Off Calendar - Case Settled Judge: Glenda |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion (petit OCF - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-15 ) | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion (resp OCF - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-15 ) | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-25-15 ) | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Separate Property Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response (for Disso - On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response (for Disso - On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Separate Property Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 06-25-15 ) | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Respondent |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Miranda, Valery - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-17 ) Filed by Respondent |
|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-11-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Family Law (visitation, $30 CR - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Hearing Set on 2015-07-15 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Family Law (visitation, $30 CR - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Ramirez, Albert - Hearing Set on 2015-07-15 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 06-11-15 ) | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |