Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SELIMA M. SILVA VS. GUILLERMO C. RUIZ
On May 29, 2015 a joint petition for summary dissolution (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Silva Selima M., represented by Robles Jesse Nava, against Castillo Ruiz Guillermo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Joint Petition for Summary Dissolution (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Dissolution
Status
Other
Case Duration
6 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for Summary Judgment - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Silva, Selima - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for Summary Judgment - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Silva, Selima - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-30 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for Summary Judgment - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Silva, Selima - Filed and Entered on 2015-11-30 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Silva, Selima - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Silva, Selima - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Silva, Selima - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |