Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
OTILIA HERRERA VS. LORENZO MUNOZ
On August 19, 2014 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Herrera Otilia, against Munoz Lorenzo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Steven R. Van Sicklen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 03, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
11 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-04 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-04 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-08-04 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sent to Dept. H for processing on . ) | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (for Default or Uncontested Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-23 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sent to Dept. H for processing on 8/3/15. ) | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration (for Default or Uncontested Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-06-23 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (rejected FL-180 and FL-170 re: spousal supp ort differ. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (rejected FL-180 and FL-170 re: spousal supp ort differ. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (-Rejected FL-170 and FL-180 are diffrent re: spousal support. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (-Rejected FL-170 and FL-180 are diffrent re: spousal support. - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice-Entry-Default (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice-Entry-Default (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Unknown department: , Van Sicklen, Steven, Presiding Case Review Conference Case Review Conference Judge: Van Sicklen Steven |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Unknown department: , Van Sicklen, Steven, Presiding Case Review Conference Judge: Steven |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-01-07 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and Final - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2015-01-07 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-05-15 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Granted on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Filed and Entered on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Herrera, Otilia - Granted on 2014-08-19 ) Filed by Petitioner |