Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AIRPORT HOLDINGS VS ROOFRX, INC.
On June 05, 2016 a breach of rental/lease contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Airport Holdings Llp, represented by Cha & Nam, against Roofrx Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Stuart M. Rice presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 05, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Torrance Courthouse
Category
Breach of Rental/Lease Contract (not unlawful detainer or wrongful eviction) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Abstract of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Plaintiff |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Stuart M. Rice 8:30 am | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department B (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Vacated) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Vacated) - |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department B (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Vacated) - |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Default Judgment Pursuant to Decl. 233 Days | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-11-14 00:00:00 | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Stuart M. Rice 8:30 am | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department B Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department B Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Breach Rental/Lease (not UD/Evict) | |
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A |
|
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A |
|
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by null Filed by null |
|
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by null |
|
June 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by AIRPORT HOLDINGS, LLP (Plaintiff) |
|