Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PATRICE HEALEY JACKSON VS. xxxxxxx xxxxx xxxxxx, ET. AL.
On June 16, 2006 an other non-personal injury/property damage tort (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Jackson Patrice Healey, represented by Jackson Jerome M., against Xxxxxx Richad Xxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Lois A. Smaltz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 16, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Torrance Courthouse
Category
Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage tort (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department M Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Previously Dismissed) - |
|
August 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
in Department M (OSC-Failure to Prosecute Case; Case Previously Dismissed) - |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by PATRICE HEALEY JACKSON (Plaintiff) |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/O PREJUDICE AS TO THE COMPLAINT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by PATRICE HEALEY JACKSON (Plaintiff) |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by PATRICE HEALEY JACKSON (Plaintiff) |
|
June 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |