Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CLAUDIA K CON VS JUGO CON JR
On August 19, 2011 a dissolution w/ minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Con Claudia Karina, against Con Hugo Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Daniel P. Ramirez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 07, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
8 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department 201, Ramirez, Daniel P., Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Ramirez Daniel P. |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department 201, Ramirez, Daniel P., Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Daniel P. |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Mod - Child Support (Other: Half of Child Care ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Mod - Child Support (Other: Half of Child Care ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Norwalk Dept. - A, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Boxer Doreen B. |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Norwalk Dept. - A, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Doreen B. |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreement - Conciliation Court Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Agreement - Conciliation Court Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Modification (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Hearing Set on 2016-04-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Regarding Address Verification - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Service Date on 2016-03-02 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Modification (Visitation (Amended) - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Hearing Set on 2016-04-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Regarding Address Verification - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Service Date on 2016-03-02 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Mod (Visitation (Amended) - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Hearing Set on 2016-04-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
RFO/MTN - Mod (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Hearing Set on 2016-04-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Signed on 2015-04-21 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (for dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia - Signed on 2015-04-21 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-30-14 ) | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 10-30-14 ) | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 10-09-14 ) | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 10-09-14 ) | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (-Community and Quasi-Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Separate Property - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (-Community and Quasi-Community - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration (Separate Property - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Con, Claudia ) Filed by Petitioner |