Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEOPLE VS BECKWITH, ANDREW DALE
An Adult Traffic case was filed by People Of The State Of California, against Beckwith, Andrew Dale, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Calaveras County, CA
Category
Adult Traffic
Case Outcome Type
Disposition
Status
Closed
Case Duration
27 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Commerical CDL | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Pled guilty requests payments | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV - Commercial Driver's License |