Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEOPLE VS ROSS, BRYON SCOTT JR
An Adult Traffic case was filed by People Of The State Of California, against Ross, Bryon Scott, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Calaveras County, CA
Category
Adult Traffic
Case Outcome Type
Plea
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Release FTP-AB 103 | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned from Collections | |
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Application to vacate civil assessment | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Verification received from collections | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Failure To Pay | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Notice Sent | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
April 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Correction | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Calendared at Request of Defendant | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | TVS Fee | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV |