Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEOPLE VS TOMSCAK, NICHOLAS ALA
An Adult Traffic case was filed by People Of The State Of California, against Tomscak, Nicholas Alan Satariano *Coll*, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Calaveras County, CA
Category
Adult Traffic
Case Outcome Type
Disposition
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Returned from FTB | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Transferred to FTB | |
August 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Verification received from collections | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure To Pay | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Application to modify sentence | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Decision and Notice of Decision | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 15, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Application to modify sentence |