Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEOPLE VS BRANSFORD, MARILYN FL
An Adult Traffic case was filed by People Of The State Of California, against Bransford, Marilyn Flynn, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 20, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Calaveras County, CA
Category
Adult Traffic
Case Outcome Type
Disposition
Status
Closed
Case Duration
6 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
August 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract to DMV | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Complete | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Defendant's Declaration Filed | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Order on Request and Declaration | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Overage | |
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 20, 2008 | Docket Event | DMV | |
January 20, 2008 | Docket Event | TVS Fee |