Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PEOPLE VS CHAPEL, MIKAH A
An Adult Traffic case was filed by People Of The State Of California, against Chapel, Mikah A, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 07, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Calaveras County, CA
Category
Adult Traffic
Case Outcome Type
Plea
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Refer to DA for warrant | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Disposition of Arrest | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Cleared | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Release FTA | |
April 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Served | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Cleared | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Release FTA | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment - FTA | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | O/R Filed | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration of financial inability to employ counsel | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Public Defender Appointed | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of arrest warrant | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Failure To Appear | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Arraignment | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation processing fee |