Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK V OROS
A Collection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Maria E. Wood presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 10, 2021
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Collection CRC 3.740-Under $10,000
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | ||
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Military Service |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in support of calculation of Accrued Interest |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in support of Entry of Judgment CCP 585(d) |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration pursuant to code of civil procedure 1033 |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Accepting copies in lieu of originals |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
November 01, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest) Vacated Judge: Marie E. Wood |
|
November 01, 2020 | hearing | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of DISCOVER BANK and filed. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest) |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92539. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment. |
|
October 22, 2020 |
LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (SOUTHWEST) Not Applicable |
||
October 22, 2020 | COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S102. (SOUTHWEST) | ||
October 22, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - SOUTHWEST) FILED 10/22/2020 OF DISCOVER BANK AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 22, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
October 22, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Not Applicable |
||
October 22, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 11/01/21 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT S102. | ||
October 22, 2020 |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
||
October 22, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 22, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92539. Not Applicable |