Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC v ROLPH
A Collection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Maria E. Wood presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 10, 2021
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Collection Assignee Decl. CRC 3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) | ||
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CC 1788.60 (a) |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (Fair Debt Buying Act)(CIV-105) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Counsel Re: 1. Interest 2. Costs (CCP 1033) 3. Attorney Fees |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC as to ALISON ROLPH; mailing date of 10/22/20 filed. |
|
October 28, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - SOUTHWEST) FILED 10/01/2020 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC AS TO ALISON ROLPH; MAILING DATE OF 10/22/20 FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Reduced Filing Fees filed |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92530. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest) |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC and filed. |
|
October 01, 2020 |
LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (SOUTHWEST) Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
Summons ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - SOUTHWEST) FILED 10/01/2020 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FEES FILED Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 | COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S102. (SOUTHWEST) | ||
October 01, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 9/30/21 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT S102. | ||
September 30, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest) Vacated Judge: Marie E. Wood |
|
September 30, 2020 | hearing | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (SOUTHWEST) |