Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TUSTIN COMMUNITY BANK -v- RODRIGUEZ Print
On October 05, 2022 a small claims > 12 claims filed case was filed by Tustin Community Bank, against Rodriguez, Allan A, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Stephanie Thornton-Harris presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 05, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Judge
Hon. Stephanie Thornton-Harris
Category
Small Claims > 12 Claims Filed
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed
Date: Feb 02, 2023Stipulated Judgment Filed
Date: Jan 30, 2023Authorization to Appear Filed
Date: Jan 30, 2023Proof of Service of Plaintffs Claim Filed
Date: Dec 23, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: Nov 30, 2022Request to Postpone Trial Filed
Date: Nov 28, 2022Claim of Plaintiff (12 filings) Filed
Date: Oct 05, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed | |
January 30, 2023 |
Department F8 - Fontana
Judge: Thornton-Harris, Stephanie |
||
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulated Judgment Filed | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear Filed | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received POS |
|
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed SUBSTITUTED SERVICE |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: The hearing has been reset. |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received rqst to postpone |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request to Postpone Trial Filed Hearing reset due to nonservice per Plaintiff's request. |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim of Plaintiff (+12 filings) Filed |