Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH VS. WHOLE FOODS MARKET
On December 05, 2006 a premise liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Cesar C. Sarmiento presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Jury Verdict
Status
Trial Verdict
Case Duration
4 years and 2 days
Verdict
Plaintiff
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Remittitur filed (COURT OF APPEAL RESPONDENTS TO RECOVER COSTS ON APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Remittitur filed (COURT OF APPEAL RESPONDENTS TO RECOVER COSTS ON APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (ntc to parties re fee for clerk's transcript on appeal and x-appeal filed ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (ntc to parties re fee for clerk's transcript on appeal and x-appeal filed 6/15/11 ) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Remittitur filed (COURT OF APPEAL RESPONDENT TO RECOVER COSTS ON APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Unknown Document Type Filed by Court |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Remittitur filed (COURT OF APPEAL RESPONDENT TO RECOVER COSTS ON APPEAL APPEAL IS DISMISSED) Filed by Court |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (TO REPORTERS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT S ON APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (TO REPORTERS TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT S ON APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (AFTER JURY VERDICT WITH COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (AFTER JURY VERDICT WITH COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Defendant |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Defendant |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice ((CROSS-APPEAL)NOTICE TO ATTORNEY I N RE NOTICE OF APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice ((CROSS-APPEAL)NOTICE TO ATTORNEY I N RE NOTICE OF APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CROSS APPEAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CROSS APPEAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Defendant |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Motion to Tax Costs - Motion Granted in Part Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Motion to Tax Costs - Submitted Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Motion to Tax Costs; Motion Granted in Part) - |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection (TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection (TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J Unknown Event Type |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Motion - Costs - Motion Denied Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Motion - Costs; Motion Denied) - |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Motion for New Trial - Submitted Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J Hearing on Motion for New Trial - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Motion for New Trial - Motion Denied Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J Hearing on Motion for New Trial (Motion for New Trial; Motion Denied) - |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application (TO SET HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application (TO SET HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department J Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF STEVEN HILST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF STEVEN HILST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL OF STEVEN HILST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL OF STEVEN HILST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memo points & authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (FOR JUDGMENT NOTIWITHSTANDING THE VERDICE (JNOW) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF ELIZABETH RIOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF STEVEN HILST, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND JUDGMENT NOT WITHSTANDING THE VERDICT (JNOV) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (APPENDIX OF NON- CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memo points & authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF ELIZABETH RIOS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (FOR NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF STEVEN HILST, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND JUDGMENT NOT WITHSTANDING THE VERDICT (JNOV) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (FOR JUDGMENT NOTIWITHSTANDING THE VERDICE (JNOW) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MARK B. CHASSMAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (APPENDIX OF NON- CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF INTENT TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF INTENT TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (AFTER JURY VERDICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment (AFTER JURY VERDICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Defendant |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department K Unknown Event Type |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Verdict Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Question (2 NOTES ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (RE EXHIBITS[1952(a)CCP] ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Verdict (RE NEGLIGENCE ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (GIVEN ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT FOR JURY FEES AND REPORTER FEES 2,586.60 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Question Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Verdict (RE PREMISES LIABILITY ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Verdict (RE NEGLIGENCE ) Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (RE EXHIBITS[1952(a)CCP] ) Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (GIVEN ) Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT FOR JURY FEES AND REPORTER FEES 2,586.60 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Question Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Verdict Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Question (2 NOTES ) Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Verdict (RE PREMISES LIABILITY ) Filed by Court |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Trial - Resumes; Jury Verdict) - |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial - Resumes - Jury Verdict Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial - Resumes - Full Day of Trial Held Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Trial - Resumes; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial - Resumes - Full Day of Trial Held Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Trial - Resumes; Full Day of Trial Held) - |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (THIRD AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (THIRD AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial - Resumes - Half Day of Trial Held Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Defendant |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Trial - Resumes; Half Day of Trial Held) - |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Trial - Resumes; Full Day of Jury Selection) - |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial - Resumes - Full Day of Jury Selection Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief (TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief (TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief (TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief (TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial - Resumes - Half Day of Jury Selection Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J (Trial - Resumes; Half Day of Jury Selection) - |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Half Day of Trial Held) - |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Jury Trial (@ 10 + 3 DAYS) - Half Day of Trial Held Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Jury Trial (@ 3 weeks) - Trial continued Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Trial continued) - |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Final Status Conference - Status Conference Held Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Status Conference Held) - |
|
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Court) - |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Transferred to Other Department Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEO, John L\. Segal, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Conference held, not settl., cont. Judge: John L. Segal |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department K Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Transferred to Other Department) - |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department O Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Conference held, not settl., cont.) - |
|
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE Filed by Clerk |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Final Status Conference - Held-Continued Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Final Status Conference - Held - Continued |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Trial Setting Conference - Held |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Telephonic Conference (RE TRIAL STATUS) - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses ((PROPOSED) JOINT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List ((PROPOSED) JOINT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List ((PROPOSED) JOINT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses ((PROPOSED) JOINT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Telephonic Conference (RE TRIAL) - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Jury Trial (@ 2- 3 WEEKS(10 days)) - Trial trailed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Final Status Conference - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Final Status Conference - Held |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CONTINUED FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CONTINUED FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CHARLES T. MATHEWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO BIFURCATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CHARLES T. MATHEWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department J Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEJ, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S PROPOSED THIRD AMENDED JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S PROPOSED THIRD AMENDED JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department WEMALW, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Final Status Conference - Court Makes Order Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court Makes Order) - |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NUMBERS 1,11,12, AND 16 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NUMBERS 1,11,12, AND 16 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF FIRM CHANGE OF ADDRESS,PHONE, AND FACSIMILE NUMBERS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF FIRM CHANGE OF ADDRESS,PHONE, AND FACSIMILE NUMBERS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CHARLES T. MATHEWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (FORMER LEGAL REPRESNTATIVE MARTIN ROBLES,ESQ NEW LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY CHARLES T. MATHEWS,ESQ. FOR PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF CHARLES T. MATHEWS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (FORMER LEGAL REPRESNTATIVE MARTIN ROBLES,ESQ NEW LEGAL REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY CHARLES T. MATHEWS,ESQ. FOR PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Final Status Conference (J/T: 7-6-09MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED BY11/26/07) - Advanced to this date & Vacated Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Trial Setting Conference - Held |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEMALW, Cesar C. Sarmiento, Presiding Trial Setting Conference (@ 3 WEEKS) - Completed Judge: Cesar C. Sarmiento |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARET APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO PLAINTIFF MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH'S PROPOSED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARET APPLICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO PLAINTIFF MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH'S PROPOSED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (AMENDED IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY TO B E OFFERED AS TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO PROPOSED CACI INSTRUCTIONS AND JURY VERDICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO PROPOSED CACI INSTRUCTIONS AND JURY VERDICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (AMENDED IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY TO B E OFFERED AS TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to Department One) - |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Court Order ((FOR TRIAL PURPOSES ONLY;)) - Transferred to Department One Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (REGARDING USE OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #16 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #11 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement - General Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (OF RELIEF PRAYED FOR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MICHAEL F. FRANK IN REPLY AND FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #14 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #12 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED JOINT LIST OF STIPULATED FACTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (VERDICT FORM SELECTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (BY PLAINTIFF REGARDING CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #17 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #15 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #11 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED JOINT LIST OF STIPULATED FACTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #12 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #15 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (REGARDING USE OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (OF RELIEF PRAYED FOR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (VERDICT FORM SELECTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (BY PLAINTIFF REGARDING CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement - General Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #16 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #17 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF MICHAEL F. FRANK IN REPLY AND FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE #14 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #7 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #2 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF EXPARTE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #4 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #1 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #5 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION IN LIMINE #9 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #8 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #12 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #3 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND RELIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION IN LIMINE #10 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO EXPARTE APPLICAIONT FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #12 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #8 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #7 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #4 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #1 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO EXPARTE APPLICAIONT FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #2 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION IN LIMINE #9 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #3 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #5 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO OPPOSITION IN LIMINE #10 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
ExParte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND RELIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME) - Motion Denied Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF EXPARTE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Motion Denied) - |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA AS TO BRAD P. AVRIT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 REGARDING TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (XRAYS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS INSPECTION OF THE ACCIDENT SITUS 30 MINUTES PRE ACCIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL SUBPOENA AS TO RYAN HOGREFE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant Filed by Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA AS TO ALEX J. BALIAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PRIOR LAWSUITS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS BELATED ADDITION OF 11 NON RETAINED EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #17 REGARDING PRECLUSINO OF TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #12 REGARDING ARGUMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING MEDICAL RECORDS AND DOCTORS TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 14 REGARDING PRECLUSION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE THAT DEFENDANT DID NOT HAVE ACTUAL AND/OR CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE THAT THE FLORAL DEPARTMENT CREATED A DANGEROUS CONDITION PRE SUBJECT ACCIDENT) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 15 REGARDING PRECLUSION OF TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #13 REGARDING EXPERT OPINIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SIBPOENA AS TO AARON FILLER, M.D. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING IMMIGRATION STATUS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #16 REGARDING PRECLUSION OF STORE MANUAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #13 REGARDING EXPERT OPINIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO 14 REGARDING PRECLUSION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA AS TO ALEX J. BALIAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 REGARDING TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (XRAYS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING IMMIGRATION STATUS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS BELATED ADDITION OF 11 NON RETAINED EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL SUBPOENA AS TO RYAN HOGREFE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA AS TO BRAD P. AVRIT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #12 REGARDING ARGUMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SIBPOENA AS TO AARON FILLER, M.D. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE THAT DEFENDANT DID NOT HAVE ACTUAL AND/OR CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE THAT THE FLORAL DEPARTMENT CREATED A DANGEROUS CONDITION PRE SUBJECT ACCIDENT) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING DEFENDANTS INSPECTION OF THE ACCIDENT SITUS 30 MINUTES PRE ACCIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 15 REGARDING PRECLUSION OF TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #16 REGARDING PRECLUSION OF STORE MANUAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING MEDICAL RECORDS AND DOCTORS TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PRIOR LAWSUITS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE #17 REGARDING PRECLUSINO OF TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PRETRIAL SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING INCOMPLETE AND/OR IMPROPER HYPOTHETICAL QUESTIONS TO AND ANSWERERED BY DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING LUPUS EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING FIBROMYALGIA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING REFERENCES TO PRIOR MEDIATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S 2 ABORTED IME(S) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING LUPUS EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING REFERENCES TO PRIOR MEDIATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S 2 ABORTED IME(S) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING INCOMPLETE AND/OR IMPROPER HYPOTHETICAL QUESTIONS TO AND ANSWERERED BY DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING FIBROMYALGIA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING PRETRIAL SETTLEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED JOINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE AS TO E.J.JANITORIAL- PENN STAR INSURANCE CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff); PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention); E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff); PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention); E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff); PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention); E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE AS TO E.J.JANITORIAL- PENN STAR INSURANCE CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEO, John L\. Segal, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Off Calendar Judge: John L. Segal |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department O Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#1 REGARDING DEFENDANT'S BELATED ADDITION OF 11 NON-RETAINED EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#5 REFERENCES TO PRIOR MEDIATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#3 IMMIGRATIONS STATUS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#9 EVIDENCE THAT DEFENDANT DID NOT HAVE ACTUAL AND/OR CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE THAT THE FLORAL DEPARTMENT CREATED A DANGEROUS CONDITION PRE SUBJECT ACCIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#4 PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT WITH CO-DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#6 PRIOR LAWSUITS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#7 PLAINTIFF'S 2 ABORTED IME(S) WITH NEUROPSYCHOLOGIST, DAVID LECHUGA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#8 DEFENDANT'S INSPECTION OF THE ACCIDENT SITUS 30 MINUTES PRE- ACCIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#10 INCOMPLETE AND/OR IMPROPER HYPOTHETICAL QUESTIONS TO AND ANSWERED BY DEFENDANT'S EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (MEDICAL RECORDS AND DOCTOR TESTIMONY RE: A COMPARISON OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBJECTIVE COMPLAINTS TO THE SUBJECTIVE COMPLAINTS OF OTHER PATIENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#11 LUPUS EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#13 FIBROMYALGIA EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#2 RE: COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (MEDICAL RECORDS AND DOCTOR TESTIMONY RE: A COMPARISON OF PLAINTIFF'S SUBJECTIVE COMPLAINTS TO THE SUBJECTIVE COMPLAINTS OF OTHER PATIENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#7 PLAINTIFF'S 2 ABORTED IME(S) WITH NEUROPSYCHOLOGIST, DAVID LECHUGA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#2 RE: COLLATERAL SOURCE PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#11 LUPUS EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#5 REFERENCES TO PRIOR MEDIATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#8 DEFENDANT'S INSPECTION OF THE ACCIDENT SITUS 30 MINUTES PRE- ACCIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#3 IMMIGRATIONS STATUS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#4 PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT WITH CO-DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#13 FIBROMYALGIA EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#10 INCOMPLETE AND/OR IMPROPER HYPOTHETICAL QUESTIONS TO AND ANSWERED BY DEFENDANT'S EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#6 PRIOR LAWSUITS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#1 REGARDING DEFENDANT'S BELATED ADDITION OF 11 NON-RETAINED EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#9 EVIDENCE THAT DEFENDANT DID NOT HAVE ACTUAL AND/OR CONSTRUCTIVE NOTICE THAT THE FLORAL DEPARTMENT CREATED A DANGEROUS CONDITION PRE SUBJECT ACCIDENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (RECORDS RECEIVED ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENAED RECORDS ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF DE-ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (RECORDS RECEIVED ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF DE-ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENAED RECORDS ) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference (F. S/C: 6-26-09J/T: 7-6-09) - Trf to Diff Dept-this Hearing Only Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Trf to Diff Dept-this Hearing Only) - |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (JURY FEES OF $150.00 POSTED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (JURY FEES OF $150.00 POSTED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEO, John L\. Segal, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order Judge: John L. Segal |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department O Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court Makes Order) - |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#16 PRECLUDING STORE MANUALS REGARDING POLICIES, PROCEDURES, SAFETY, MATS AND FLORAL DEPARTMENTS INFORMATION CONTAINED THEREIN AS PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT BRAD AVRIT) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#14 PRECLUDINGNON RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS JOSEPH EZER FROM TESTIFYING DUE TO FAILURE TO SUBMIT TO A DEPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#13 PRECLUDING EXPERT OPINIONS NOT OFFERED DURING THEIR DEPOSITION TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#17 PRECLUDING TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE, OR ARGUMENT AS TO RETENTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#11 PRELCUDING PROFERRING THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT WTINESS ALEX BALIAN AS DUPLICATIVE OF PLAINTIFFS RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS BRAD AVRIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#15 PRECLUDING TESTIMONY, OPINIONS AND ARGUMENT AS TO DESTRUCTION LOSS, OR ABSENCE OF A SUPPOSED SURVEILLANCE TAPE OF FALL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#12 PRECLUDING ANY ARGUMENT REFERENCE, OR RELIANCE UPON OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S WITHDRAWN RETAINED EXPERT STEPHEN ROSEN AS PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#15 PRECLUDING TESTIMONY, OPINIONS AND ARGUMENT AS TO DESTRUCTION LOSS, OR ABSENCE OF A SUPPOSED SURVEILLANCE TAPE OF FALL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#14 PRECLUDINGNON RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS JOSEPH EZER FROM TESTIFYING DUE TO FAILURE TO SUBMIT TO A DEPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#17 PRECLUDING TESTIMONY, EVIDENCE, OR ARGUMENT AS TO RETENTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#13 PRECLUDING EXPERT OPINIONS NOT OFFERED DURING THEIR DEPOSITION TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#12 PRECLUDING ANY ARGUMENT REFERENCE, OR RELIANCE UPON OPINIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S WITHDRAWN RETAINED EXPERT STEPHEN ROSEN AS PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#11 PRELCUDING PROFERRING THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT WTINESS ALEX BALIAN AS DUPLICATIVE OF PLAINTIFFS RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS BRAD AVRIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (#16 PRECLUDING STORE MANUALS REGARDING POLICIES, PROCEDURES, SAFETY, MATS AND FLORAL DEPARTMENTS INFORMATION CONTAINED THEREIN AS PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERT BRAD AVRIT) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
May 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS RECEIVED. ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS RECEIVED. ) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS RECEIVED. ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUBPOENA DOCUMENTS RECEIVED. ) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Receipt (subpoena documents from custodian of records Peter Cornell, M.D ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Plaintiff |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Receipt (subpoena documents from custodian of records Peter Cornell, M.D ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of custodian of records ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of custodian of records ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice (CHANGE OF ADDRESS, PHONE NUMBER AND FAX NUMBER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice (CHANGE OF ADDRESS, PHONE NUMBER AND FAX NUMBER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (of errata re mandatory settlement conference and final status conference dates ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (of errata re mandatory settlement conference and final status conference dates ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Mandatory Settlement Conference - Advanced to this date & continued Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order (RE: JURY REFUND; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR REFUND OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR REFUND OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order (RE: JURY REFUND; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Intervenor |
|
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Off Calendar) - |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Off Calendar Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (JOINT- RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement ((PARTIAL: AS TO DEFENDANT PENN-STAR INSURANCE CO., ONLY); ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice-Settlement ((PARTIAL: AS TO DEFENDANT PENN-STAR INSURANCE CO., ONLY); ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Trial continued Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (JOINT- RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Trial continued) - |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER MOTION IN NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE PLAINTIFF'S THEORIES ON MODE OF OPERATION FACTORS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF ROSEN'S TESTING AND CONDITION OF THE FLOOR AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (OF RELIEF PRAYER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO LIMIT MEDICAL SPECIALS TO HEALTH INSURANCE, MEDICAL CARE, AND MEDICAL PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM OFFERING DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES WHICH WERE NOT PRODUCED OR DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF DURING DISCOVERY) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (STATEMENT BY PLAINTIFF RE: CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF NEW AND UNPLED THEORIES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF GINA LEWIS HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE AND LIMIT THE CALLING OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS DISMISSED CROSS-COMPLAINTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY TO BE OFFERED AS TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S PHOTOGRAPHS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (PROPOSED CACI JURY INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED LIST OF AFFIRMATION DEFENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (OF RELIEF PRAYER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S PHOTOGRAPHS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
List of Witnesses (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (STATEMENT BY PLAINTIFF RE: CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM OFFERING DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES WHICH WERE NOT PRODUCED OR DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF DURING DISCOVERY) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS DISMISSED CROSS-COMPLAINTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER MOTION IN NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE PLAINTIFF'S THEORIES ON MODE OF OPERATION FACTORS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO LIMIT MEDICAL SPECIALS TO HEALTH INSURANCE, MEDICAL CARE, AND MEDICAL PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF NEW AND UNPLED THEORIES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE AND LIMIT THE CALLING OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF ROSEN'S TESTING AND CONDITION OF THE FLOOR AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of the Case Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF GINA LEWIS HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DOCUMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED IDENTIFICATION OF DISCOVERY TO BE OFFERED AS TESTIMONY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED LIST OF AFFIRMATION DEFENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions (PROPOSED CACI JURY INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Motion - Summary Judgment (2. MOTION TO COMPEL;3. (2) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) - Off-Calendar-Request-Moving Party Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES;) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES;) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO PSIC MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF EXPERTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO PSIC MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF EXPERTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: DISMISSED CROSS-COMPLAINTS BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 RE: MEDICAL SPECIALS, ETC. BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 RE: DOCUMENTS & WITNESSES NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 RE: NEW & UNPLED THEORIES BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: REMEDIAL MEASURES BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS,INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 RE: THEORIES ON MODE OF OPERATION BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 RE:ROSEN TESTING BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 RE: UNPAID MEDICAL EXPENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 RE: SPOILATION OF EVIDENCE BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKET, INC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: LANDOWNER DUTY TO PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: EXPERT WITNESSES BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 RE: PLAINTIFF PHOTOGRAPHS BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: REFERENCES TO E.C. JANITORIAL AND PENN-STAR INSURANCE CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 RE: STEPHEN ROSEN TESTING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: REMEDIAL MEASURES BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS,INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 RE: STEPHEN ROSEN TESTING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 RE: UNPAID MEDICAL EXPENSES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: LANDOWNER DUTY TO PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: REFERENCES TO E.C. JANITORIAL AND PENN-STAR INSURANCE CO. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 RE: DOCUMENTS & WITNESSES NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 RE: PLAINTIFF PHOTOGRAPHS BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: DISMISSED CROSS-COMPLAINTS BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 RE: THEORIES ON MODE OF OPERATION BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 RE: MEDICAL SPECIALS, ETC. BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 RE:ROSEN TESTING BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 RE: NEW & UNPLED THEORIES BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 RE: SPOILATION OF EVIDENCE BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKET, INC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: EXPERT WITNESSES BY DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKETS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS RE: DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES (RETAINED AND NON-RETAINED) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ORDER RE: NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS RE: DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES (RETAINED AND NON-RETAINED) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR ORDER RE: NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (LODGING OF ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (LODGING OF ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF EXPERTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO MOVING PARTY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICE, SERVICE & HEARING OF PSIC'S (1) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF EXPERTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AND (2) MOTION TO COMPEL ...) Filed by Atty. for Defend. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Defend. in Intervention |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (IN ABSENTIA TO EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO GIVE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER(S), ETC.; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Lodge Transcript/Record (OF RYAN WADE HOGREFE AND ARASH MOZAFFARI WITH HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (BY PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO EVIDENCE CODE, SECTIONS 452 (d) AND 453 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ AT BAR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF...) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF EXPERTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (BY PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO EVIDENCE CODE, SECTIONS 452 (d) AND 453 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ AT BAR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO MOVING PARTY'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Lodge Transcript/Record (OF RYAN WADE HOGREFE AND ARASH MOZAFFARI WITH HER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (IN ABSENTIA TO EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO GIVE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER(S), ETC.; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR NOTICE, SERVICE & HEARING OF PSIC'S (1) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF EXPERTS DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFF AND (2) MOTION TO COMPEL ...) Filed by Atty. for Defend. in Intervention |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF...) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE PLAINTIFFS THEORIES ON MODE OF OPERATION FACTORS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF NEW AND UNPLED THEORIES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT STEPHEN ROSEN REGARDING TESTING AND CODE VIOLATIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (VIA FACSIMILE OF MOTION IN LIMINE (1-4) AND DECLARATION OF WARREN S. FUJIMOTO ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S PHOTOGRAPHS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE AND LIMIT THE CALLING OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF WARREN S. FUJIMOTO RE: MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS ON PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS DISMISSED CROSS- COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL CHARGES THAT WERE NOT PAID ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM OFFERING DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES WHICH WERE NOT PRODUCED OR DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF DURING DISCOVERY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO ALLOW THE USE OF E.C. JANITORIAL'S NAME AT TRIAL AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCES TO PENN- STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT E.C. JANITORIAL OWED PLAINTIFF A LANDOWNER'S DUTY TO MAINTAIN THE PREMISIS IN A REASONABLY SAFE CONDITION ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF ROSEN'S TESTING AND CONDITION OF THE FLOOR AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO LIMIT MEDICAL SPECIALS TO HEALTH INSURANCE, MEDICAL CARE, AND MEDICAL PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (VIA PERSONAL SERVICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE (1-4) AND DECLARATION OF WARREN S. FUJIMOTO ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL CHARGES THAT WERE NOT PAID ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO ALLOW THE USE OF E.C. JANITORIAL'S NAME AT TRIAL AND TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCES TO PENN- STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (VIA PERSONAL SERVICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE (1-4) AND DECLARATION OF WARREN S. FUJIMOTO ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT THAT E.C. JANITORIAL OWED PLAINTIFF A LANDOWNER'S DUTY TO MAINTAIN THE PREMISIS IN A REASONABLY SAFE CONDITION ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (PRECLUDING PLAINTIFF FROM OFFERING DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES WHICH WERE NOT PRODUCED OR DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF DURING DISCOVERY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE AND LIMIT THE CALLING OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESSES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF NEW AND UNPLED THEORIES AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF ROSEN'S TESTING AND CONDITION OF THE FLOOR AT TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS DISMISSED CROSS- COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO LIMIT MEDICAL SPECIALS TO HEALTH INSURANCE, MEDICAL CARE, AND MEDICAL PAYMENTS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE PLAINTIFFS THEORIES ON MODE OF OPERATION FACTORS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S PHOTOGRAPHS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF WARREN S. FUJIMOTO RE: MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS ON PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (VIA FACSIMILE OF MOTION IN LIMINE (1-4) AND DECLARATION OF WARREN S. FUJIMOTO ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT STEPHEN ROSEN REGARDING TESTING AND CODE VIOLATIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion - Summary Judgment; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Hearing-Other (RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARINGON DEFENDANT PENN-STAR INSURANCECOMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT;) - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K (Hearing-Other; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. dba WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PENN-STAR INSURANCE CO'S. MSJ;) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (TO RESCHEDULE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE HRG. ON MSJ AND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINITFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (TO RESCHEDULE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE HRG. ON MSJ AND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by Intervenor |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. dba WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PENN-STAR INSURANCE CO'S. MSJ;) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINITFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING OF PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Court Order - Order is signed & filed Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Court Order (Court Order; Order is signed & filed) - |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs (HEARING ON DEFENDANT, PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT... ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs (HEARING ON DEFENDANT, PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT... ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Intervenor Filed by Intervenor |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by Intervenor |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENOR PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY ) Filed by Intervenor |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING ON MRS. GOOSH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKET, INC, DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING ON MRS. GOOSH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKET, INC, DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
July 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Motion - Protection Order - Motion Denied Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
July 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (Motion - Protection Order; Motion Denied) - |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GINA LEWIS HANNAH IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GINA LEWIS HANNAH IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Motion - Protection Order ((FILED BY MRS. GOOCH'S NATURALFOOD MARKETS, INC. dba WholeFoods Market)) - Not Held-Continued Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (Motion - Protection Order; Not Held-Continued) - |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Court Order - Advanced to this date & Vacated Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Court Order - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Motion for Leave - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ECJ'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ECJ'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO ECJ'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKET FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. FOR ORDER RE: NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF AUTHORITIES; ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT, WHOLE FOODS MARKET FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. FOR ORDER RE: NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF AUTHORITIES; ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO ECJ'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY PSIC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY PSIC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANT, E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO INTERVENE ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO INTERVENE ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to this date & continued) - |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: REVIVOR OF E.C. JANITORIAL;) - Trial continued Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K (Order to Show Cause; Trial continued) - |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF DE-ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL AFSHIN DAVID YOUSSEFYEH FROM PLTF MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF DE-ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL AFSHIN DAVID YOUSSEFYEH FROM PLTF MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF ANGELO DUPLANTIER IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST JAMES SPALTRO, ANGELO DUPLANTIER, WARREN FUJIMOTO AND/OR THE LAW OFFICES OF GILBERT, KELLY,...) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF ANGELO DUPLANTIER IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST JAMES SPALTRO, ANGELO DUPLANTIER, WARREN FUJIMOTO AND/OR THE LAW OFFICES OF GILBERT, KELLY,...) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF IZA YOUSSEFYEH IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF COSTS AND/OR SANCTIONS AS AGAINST DEFENDANT...) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF IZA YOUSSEFYEH IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF COSTS AND/OR SANCTIONS AS AGAINST DEFENDANT...) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion - Summary Judgment; Motion Denied) - |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Motion - Summary Judgment - Motion Denied Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVEV SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO DECLARATION OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE E.C. JANITORIAL'S PLEADINGS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE E.C. JANITORIAL'S PLEADINGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SHORTEN THE NOTICE PERIOD FOR THE DEPOSITION OF SABRINA SOKUL AND/OR TO ALLOW THE DEPOSITION OF SABRINA SOKUL...) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVEV SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE E.C. JANITORIAL'S PLEADINGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SHORTEN THE NOTICE PERIOD FOR THE DEPOSITION OF SABRINA SOKUL AND/OR TO ALLOW THE DEPOSITION OF SABRINA SOKUL...) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO DECLARATION OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE E.C. JANITORIAL'S PLEADINGS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash (SUBPOENAS ISSUED BY DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME, AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (AND OBJECTIONS TO WHOLE FOODS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike (DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL'S ANSWER AND/OR ITS MOTIONS, DISCOVERY AND SUBPOENAS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME, AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash (SUBPOENAS ISSUED BY DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (AND OBJECTIONS TO WHOLE FOODS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME, AND MOTION TO STRIKE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike (DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL'S ANSWER AND/OR ITS MOTIONS, DISCOVERY AND SUBPOENAS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME, AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Motion Granted Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO DECLARATION OF STEPHEN ROSEN SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S APRIL 3, 2008 UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL,INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S APRIL 3,2008 OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL,INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO DECLARATION OF STEPHEN ROSEN SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response (TO PLAINTIFF'S APRIL 3, 2008 UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL,INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S APRIL 3,2008 OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL,INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Reply To Motion (REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERAIL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO E.C. JANITORIAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERAIL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO E.C. JANITORIAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement (SUPPLEMENTAL PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO WHOLE FOODS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Supplement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE/EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO E.C. JANITORIAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE: DECLARATION OF ROBERT PRATI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF WHOLE FOODS MARKET AND EC. JANITORIAL, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO WHOLE FOODS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF STEPHEN ROSEN, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICAITON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO WHOLE FOODS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO E.C. JANITORIAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration (OF STEPHEN ROSEN, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICAITON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed (WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE: DECLARATION OF ROBERT PRATI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF WHOLE FOODS MARKET AND EC. JANITORIAL, INC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE/EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF LIZA YOUSSEFYEH SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO DEFENDANT E.C. JANITORIAL, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO DEFENDANT WHOLE FOODS MARKET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Opposition Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement - General Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT- JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. DBA WHOLE FOODS MARKET ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT- JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department WEK, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Exparte proceeding - Denied Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department K Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) - |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Former Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLEADINGS IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE/EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLEADINGS IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (AND REFERENCE TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE/EXHIBITS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Und. Facts Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion (MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party); WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator Filed by Mediator |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement (FIRST SANA FILED. MEDIATION ENDED IN NONAGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator Filed by Mediator |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement (FIRST SANA FILED. MEDIATION ENDED IN NONAGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR (11/26/07CYNTHIA PASTERNAK, MEDIATOR) - Non-Agreement Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy (Closed-ADR; Non-Agreement) - |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department K Unknown Event Type |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Assign.-Med Hearing Date Filed by Mediator Filed by Mediator |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Assign.-Med Hrg Date Filed by Mediator Filed by Mediator |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Assign.-Med Hrg Date Filed by Mediator |
|
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Assign.-Med Hearing Date Filed by Mediator |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk |
|
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department WEC, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Trial Set Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Set) - |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by MRS.GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., (Legacy Party) |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
May 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
May 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint (ON BEHALF OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. , (DOE 1) ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
May 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint (ON BEHALF OF E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. , (DOE 1) ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp |
|
May 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by E.C. JANITORIAL, INC. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department WEC, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Initial Status Conference - Completed Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Initial Status Conference - Held |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department Legacy Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Demurrer; Off Calendar) - |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department WEC, Joseph S\. Biderman, Presiding Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT) - Off Calendar Judge: Joseph S. Biderman |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (of dem. hearing off calendar ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Cross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (of dem. hearing off calendar ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by MAHVASH PARNASSIZADEH (Plaintiff) |