Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HITOSHI SEKIGAMI VS. MONEZA QURESHI ET. AL
On December 05, 2006 a motor vehicle - pi/pd/wd (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Jacqueline A. Connor presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Monica Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department WEI, Jacqueline A. Connor, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Case Previously Dismissed Judge: Jacqueline A. Connor |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department WEI, Jacqueline A. Connor, Presiding Initial Status Conference - Status Conference Held Judge: Jacqueline A. Connor |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (BY MAIL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION RE DILIGENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference (ISC OSC 3/23/07 JUDGE CONNOR REQUEST CMC STATEMENT ) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |