Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DAVID KORRIE VS. BIJAN PIROUZ, ET AL
On October 22, 2003 a breach contrct/warnty (sellr pltf) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge John L. Segal presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2003
Last Refreshed
February 18, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Monica Courthouse
Category
Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Reclassified-Limited-Santa Monica
Status
Transfer
Case Duration
3 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2004 | hearing |
Proof of Service (SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 16, 2004 | hearing |
Proof of Service (SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 16, 2004 | hearing |
Proof of Service (BY MAIL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 16, 2004 | hearing |
Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 05, 2004 | hearing |
Proof of Service of Summons & Com (PARTY SERVED: REAL ESTATE CONSULT- ING, A CORPORATION. DAN DOLDZIEJSK, PERSON AUTHROIZED TO ACCEPT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 02, 2004 | hearing |
Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft |
|
February 10, 2004 | hearing |
Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION SENT TO: ATTY FOR PLTF:MARK LUEVANO ATTY FOR DEFT:JONATHON HERZOG ) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 10, 2004 | hearing |
Miscellaneous-Other (receipt for record re: transfer of case file sent to Santa Monica Ltd courthouse on 2-10-04 ) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 05, 2004 | hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
February 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department WEC, John L. Segal, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv. (AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCEAND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RERECLASSIFICATION) - OSC held & order is made Judge: John L. Segal |
|
January 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
in Department WEC, John L. Segal, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order Judge: John L. Segal |
|
January 23, 2004 | hearing |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 21, 2004 | hearing |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 22, 2003 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |