Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PETTY VS PARKER
A Domestic Violence With Minor Children case was filed by Petty, Samantha J, against Parker, Austin E, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Benavides, Jose R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 23, 2014
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Compton, James L.;Category
Domestic Violence With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | hearing |
NP1105 Department: D Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY *************************************************************************************** NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CAUSE DROPPED IN COURT PREVIOUSLY ORDERED RESTRAINING ORDERS DISSOLVED THIS DATE. |
|
January 08, 2015 | hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET DV/TRONO SERVICE |
|
January 08, 2015 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRONO SERVICE Judge: Compton, James L. |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NP1105 Department: D Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY *************************************************************************************** NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: CAUSE DROPPED IN COURT PREVIOUSLY ORDERED RESTRAINING ORDERS DISSOLVED THIS DATE. |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence PET DV/TRONO SERVICE Judge: Compton, James L. |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET DV/TRONO SERVICE |
|
December 29, 2014 | hearing |
Emergency Protective Order Received BPD |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Emergency Protective Order Received BPD |
|
December 24, 2014 | hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for DV/TRO |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for DV/TRO |
|
December 23, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) PET HRG: 1/8/15 |
|
December 23, 2014 | hearing |
Temporary Restraining Order / Notice of Hearing ALL GRANTED |
|
December 23, 2014 | hearing |
Request for Order Document Image |
|
December 23, 2014 | hearing |
Court Interpreter Services - FL NONE |
|
December 23, 2014 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy. |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Document Image |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Interpreter Services - FL NONE |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) PET HRG: 1/8/15 |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy. |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order / Notice of Hearing ALL GRANTED |