Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RICHARTE V RICHARTE
A Domestic Violence With Minor Children case was filed by Richarte, Vincent L, against Richarte, Rachel, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Domestic Violence With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2015 | hearing | Proof of Service of Summons | |
May 05, 2015 | hearing |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $8.00 for RICHARTE VINCENT L (PE-1). Received from RICHARTE VINCENT. Receipt #837692 for amount of $8.00. |
|
May 05, 2015 | hearing |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage PET |
|
May 05, 2015 | hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed PET |
|
May 05, 2015 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PET |
|
May 05, 2015 | hearing |
Request to Waive Court Fees PET $435.00 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage PET |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $8.00 for RICHARTE VINCENT L (PE-1). Received from RICHARTE VINCENT. Receipt #837692 for amount of $8.00. |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees PET $435.00 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PET |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed PET |
|
May 21, 2010 | hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 20, 2010 | hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for POS OF ROAH FAXED TO KCSO |
|
May 20, 2010 | hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: ROAH, C/C C/V ORDER, SUPERVISED C/V ORDER WHO SERVED: RACHEL RICHARTE HOW SERVED: MAIL DATE MAILED: 5-18-10 |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: ROAH, C/C C/V ORDER, SUPERVISED C/V ORDER WHO SERVED: RACHEL RICHARTE HOW SERVED: MAIL DATE MAILED: 5-18-10 |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for POS OF ROAH FAXED TO KCSO |
|
May 14, 2010 | hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for ROAH FAXED TO KCSO |
|
May 14, 2010 | hearing |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER EXP 05/12/13 - JDO |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for ROAH FAXED TO KCSO |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing - CLETS RESTRAINING ORDER EXP 05/12/13 - JDO |
|
May 12, 2010 | hearing |
NP1040 Department: B Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: RESTRAINING ORDERS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ALISON KITCHEN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR JULIE TEDFORD ON BEHALF OF VINCENT L RICHARTE (PE-1). NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO ISSUE RESTRAINING ORDERS. THESE WILL BE GRANTED ON THE SAME TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TEMPORARY ORDERS EXCEPT AS MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: COURT INCLUDES ALL THE CHILDREN AS FIRST REQUESTED.. ORDERS ARE GOOD FOR 3 YEARS MOTHER TO COME TO COURT AND REQUEST MODIFICATION IF SHE WANT CHANGES. MS. KITCHEN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
May 12, 2010 | hearing | Mother Failed to Appear for Mediation | |
May 12, 2010 | hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
May 12, 2010 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause PET REISSUE DV TRO 4 MINORS Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
May 12, 2010 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Mediator, FCS |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause PET REISSUE DV TRO 4 MINORS Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP1040 Department: B Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE: RESTRAINING ORDERS THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ALISON KITCHEN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR JULIE TEDFORD ON BEHALF OF VINCENT L RICHARTE (PE-1). NO APPEARANCE BY RESPONDENT THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: THE COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO ISSUE RESTRAINING ORDERS. THESE WILL BE GRANTED ON THE SAME TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TEMPORARY ORDERS EXCEPT AS MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: COURT INCLUDES ALL THE CHILDREN AS FIRST REQUESTED.. ORDERS ARE GOOD FOR 3 YEARS MOTHER TO COME TO COURT AND REQUEST MODIFICATION IF SHE WANT CHANGES. MS. KITCHEN TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. |
|
May 05, 2010 | hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for POS OF DV/TRO FAXED TO KCSO |
|
May 05, 2010 | hearing |
Proof of Personal Service WHAT SERVED: REISSUE DV/TRO, C/C C/V ORDER, C/V AND SUPPORT REQUEST, NOTICE OF HEARING WHO SERVED: RACHEL RICHARTE DATE SERVED: 04/28/10 |
|
May 05, 2010 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice ANSWER TO DV/TRO RETUREND TO RESPONDENT VIA MAIL: DOES NOT CONFORM TO RULE 2.100-2.119 & NEED TO ATTACH PROOF OF SERVICE ON OPPOSING PARTY |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice ANSWER TO DV/TRO RETUREND TO RESPONDENT VIA MAIL: DOES NOT CONFORM TO RULE 2.100-2.119 & NEED TO ATTACH PROOF OF SERVICE ON OPPOSING PARTY |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service WHAT SERVED: REISSUE DV/TRO, C/C C/V ORDER, C/V AND SUPPORT REQUEST, NOTICE OF HEARING WHO SERVED: RACHEL RICHARTE DATE SERVED: 04/28/10 |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for POS OF DV/TRO FAXED TO KCSO |
|
April 30, 2010 | hearing |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
April 30, 2010 | hearing |
4999 Mediation Appointment New Calendar |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
4999 Mediation Appointment New Calendar |
|
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
4113 OSC Domestic Violence New Calendar |
|
April 26, 2010 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: PRO PER NEW ATTORNEY: JULIE TEDFOR ( GBLA) |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys OLD ATTORNEY: PRO PER NEW ATTORNEY: JULIE TEDFOR ( GBLA) |
|
April 23, 2010 | hearing |
Reissue Temporary Restraining Order WHAT: REISSUE DV, TRO COURT DATE: 5/12/10 COURT TIME: 8:30 COURT DEPT/DIV: C |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reissue Temporary Restraining Order WHAT: REISSUE DV, TRO COURT DATE: 5/12/10 COURT TIME: 8:30 COURT DEPT/DIV: C |
|
April 19, 2010 | hearing |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for DV/TRO CLETS FAXED TO KCSO |
|
April 19, 2010 | hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) WHAT: PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROPERTY CONTROL HEARING: 4/30/10 @ 8:30 AM DIV C |
|
April 19, 2010 | hearing | Temporary Restraining Order / Notice of Hearing | |
April 19, 2010 | hearing | Request for Order | |
April 19, 2010 | hearing |
Interpreter Information NONE |
|
April 19, 2010 | hearing |
Case Number Reassigned Reassigned case number, S-1501-XX-5246, as S-1501-FL-613334 |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Interpreter Information NONE |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Number Reassigned Reassigned case number, S-1501-XX-5246, as S-1501-FL-613334 |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
FLDV Documents Forwarded to Law Enforcement for DV/TRO CLETS FAXED TO KCSO |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109) WHAT: PET DV/TRO C/C C/V PROPERTY CONTROL HEARING: 4/30/10 @ 8:30 AM DIV C |