Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BENNETT VS BENNETT
A Dissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children case was filed by Bennett, Tammie M, against Bennett, Brian M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge John L. Fielder presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 21, 2007
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2016 | hearing |
Copies Provided as Requested MAILED CERT JUDGEMENT TO PET. |
|
October 06, 2016 | hearing |
Image of Archived Documents JUDGMENT OF DISSO 11/12/1991 |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents JUDGMENT OF DISSO 11/12/1991 |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copies Provided as Requested MAILED CERT JUDGEMENT TO PET. |
|
January 09, 2008 | hearing |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: ORDER AFTER HEARING WHO SERVED: TAMMIE M BENNETT HOW SERVED: MAIL DATE SERVED: 01/07/08 |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service WHAT SERVED: ORDER AFTER HEARING WHO SERVED: TAMMIE M BENNETT HOW SERVED: MAIL DATE SERVED: 01/07/08 |
|
December 21, 2007 | hearing |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE: 12/7/07 JUDGE BROWNLEE CCP635 |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings and Orders HEARING DATE: 12/7/07 JUDGE BROWNLEE CCP635 |
|
December 11, 2007 | hearing | Responsive Declaration | |
December 07, 2007 | hearing |
NP1070 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND TERMINATE CHILD SUPPORT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER. BRIAN M BENNETT (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: MINOR CHILDREN ARE 18 AND 19 YEARS OF AGE. CHILD SUPPORT IS TERMINATED FORTHWITH. |
|
December 07, 2007 | hearing |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
December 07, 2007 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause RESP NOM C/S TERMINATE C/S Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
4109 Motion (Resp) New Calendar |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1070 Department: C Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S MOTION RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND TERMINATE CHILD SUPPORT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PETITIONER. BRIAN M BENNETT (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: MINOR CHILDREN ARE 18 AND 19 YEARS OF AGE. CHILD SUPPORT IS TERMINATED FORTHWITH. |
|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RESP NOM C/S TERMINATE C/S Judge: Fielder, John L. |
|
November 29, 2007 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED RESPONSIVE DEC TO PETITIONER-NO PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice RETURNED RESPONSIVE DEC TO PETITIONER-NO PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
November 28, 2007 | hearing |
171C Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $40.00 for BENNETT, BRIAN M (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 5683099676. Receipt #355462 for amount of $40.00. |
|
November 28, 2007 | hearing |
806K Pmt: First Appearance Family Law GC 70670(D) (1/1/06) Amount of $320.00 for BENNETT, BRIAN M (RE-1). Received from BRIAN BENNETT. Receipt #355436 for amount of $320.00. |
|
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
171C Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $40.00 for BENNETT, BRIAN M (RE-1). Received from RESPONDENT, check no(s) 5683099676. Receipt #355462 for amount of $40.00. |
|
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
806K Pmt: First Appearance Family Law GC 70670(D) (1/1/06) Amount of $320.00 for BENNETT, BRIAN M (RE-1). Received from BRIAN BENNETT. Receipt #355436 for amount of $320.00. |
|
November 27, 2007 | hearing |
Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service CHERYL WILSON- KERN LDA #32 |
|
November 27, 2007 | hearing |
Notice of Motion RE: TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING DATE: 12/7/07 HEARING TIME: 08:30 HEARING DEPT/DIV:C |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service CHERYL WILSON- KERN LDA #32 |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion RE: TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT HEARING DATE: 12/7/07 HEARING TIME: 08:30 HEARING DEPT/DIV:C |
|
November 21, 2007 | hearing |
See ROA Prior to 09/08/97 PET PAID 1ST APPEARANCE FEE RESP MUST PAY CURRENT 1ST APPEARANCE FEE |
|
November 21, 2007 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 245 |
|
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
See ROA Prior to 09/08/97 PET PAID 1ST APPEARANCE FEE RESP MUST PAY CURRENT 1ST APPEARANCE FEE |
|
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 245 |