Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IBARRA V IBARRA
A Dissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children case was filed by Ibarra, Rebecca Bustamante, against Ibarra, Felix Romero, in the jurisdiction of Kern County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 08, 1997
Last Refreshed
November 21, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Dissolution of Marriage Without Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Consolidation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2006 | hearing |
Case Consolidated FL-526906 & FD-10653 CONSOLIDATED W/ FL-571789 (LEAD) |
|
August 14, 2006 | hearing |
4163 Motion (DCSS) New Calendar |
|
August 14, 2006 | hearing |
Motion (DCSS) CONSOLIDATE W/ FSO 10653 AND 571789 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated FL-526906 & FD-10653 CONSOLIDATED W/ FL-571789 (LEAD) |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion (DCSS) CONSOLIDATE W/ FSO 10653 AND 571789 Judge: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
4163 Motion (DCSS) New Calendar |
|
June 14, 2006 | hearing |
Notice of Motion RE: CONSOLIDATE W/ FD 10653 AND 571789 HEARING DATE: 08-14-06 HEARING TIME: 8:15AM HEARING DEPT/DIV: DIV F RM 300 FILED BY DCSS |
|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion RE: CONSOLIDATE W/ FD 10653 AND 571789 HEARING DATE: 08-14-06 HEARING TIME: 8:15AM HEARING DEPT/DIV: DIV F RM 300 FILED BY DCSS |
|
January 09, 2003 | hearing |
Stipulation & Order for Release of License Filed by: DCSS |
|
January 09, 2003 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 360 |
|
January 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order for Release of License Filed by: DCSS |
|
January 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 360 |
|
September 08, 1997 | hearing |
See ROA Prior to 09/08/97 NO FEES C/S JUDGMENT 9/20/89 MODS 9/20/96 NO C/S RENEWAL |
|
September 08, 1997 | Docket Event |
See ROA Prior to 09/08/97 NO FEES C/S JUDGMENT 9/20/89 MODS 9/20/96 NO C/S RENEWAL |