Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MEREDITH VS MARAVILLA
A 22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Chapin, Sidney P. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 05, 2011
Last Refreshed
November 19, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
22-CV Auto - Civil Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 2 days
Time To Trial
1 year and 19 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2012 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1385 WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1385 Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Calendar Notes: WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1385 WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.1385 Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
May 04, 2012 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated DISMISSAL FILED 4/30/2012 ~ calid=1875011 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:05/07/2012, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:10, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:shannaw, SystemDate:3/23/2012 11:59:16 AM |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated DISMISSAL FILED 4/30/2012 ~ calid=1875011 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4170, CourtDate:05/07/2012, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:10, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:shannaw, SystemDate:3/23/2012 11:59:16 AM |
|
April 30, 2012 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY TREVOR M. QUIRK, ESQ |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. FILED BY TREVOR M. QUIRK, ESQ |
|
April 23, 2012 | hearing |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: T/E 4 DAYS T/E 4 DAYS Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Calendar Notes: T/E 4 DAYS T/E 4 DAYS Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
April 13, 2012 | hearing |
Final Case Management Conference Calendar Notes: T/E 4 DAYS//JURY TRIAL 04/23/12 T/E 4 DAYS//JURY TRIAL 04/23/12 Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference Calendar Notes: T/E 4 DAYS//JURY TRIAL 04/23/12 T/E 4 DAYS//JURY TRIAL 04/23/12 Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
March 26, 2012 | hearing |
Case Management Statement FILEDE BY TREVOR QUIRK COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. 04/13/12 1:00PM IN DEPARTMENT 4. |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement FILEDE BY TREVOR QUIRK COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. 04/13/12 1:00PM IN DEPARTMENT 4. |
|
March 23, 2012 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated RELEASE AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO BE FILED ~ calid=1737001 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4142, CourtDate:04/13/2012, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CFM, Judge:SPC, Deputy:juliew, SystemDate:10/19/2011 2:55:32 PM |
|
March 23, 2012 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated RELEASE & DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO BE FILED ~ calid=1737000 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4000, CourtDate:04/23/2012, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:5, SessionType:CTC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:juliew, SystemDate:10/19/2011 2:55:11 PM |
|
March 23, 2012 | hearing |
NP1440 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ATTORNEY TREVOR QUIRK MAKES SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR/WITH PLAINTIFF JOAN MEREDITH. ISMAEL MARAVILLA (DE-1) APPEARS BY LARRY F PEAKE ESQ. ALSO PRESENT: VICKI MILLER WITH STATE FARM. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED PRIOR TO THE HEARING. JILL FERGUSON AS COURT REPORTER PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN VICKI MILLER IS DULY SWORN. SETTLEMENT REACHED AS FOLLOWS: IN EXCHANGE FOR A WAIVER OF COSTS, EACH PARTY WILL ASSUME THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES AND A DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE WILL BE FILED BY PLAINTIFF. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 04/13/2012 VACATED. JURY TRIAL ON 04/23/2012 VACATED. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 05/07/2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO PREPARE RELEASE AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
March 23, 2012 | hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: T/E 4 DAYS CFM 4-13-12 / TD 4-23-12 |
|
March 23, 2012 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference T/E 4 DAYS CFM 4-13-12 / TD 4-23-12 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated RELEASE & DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO BE FILED ~ calid=1737000 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4000, CourtDate:04/23/2012, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:5, SessionType:CTC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:juliew, SystemDate:10/19/2011 2:55:11 PM |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference T/E 4 DAYS CFM 4-13-12 / TD 4-23-12 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated RELEASE AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO BE FILED ~ calid=1737001 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4142, CourtDate:04/13/2012, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CFM, Judge:SPC, Deputy:juliew, SystemDate:10/19/2011 2:55:32 PM |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
NP1440 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ATTORNEY TREVOR QUIRK MAKES SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR/WITH PLAINTIFF JOAN MEREDITH. ISMAEL MARAVILLA (DE-1) APPEARS BY LARRY F PEAKE ESQ. ALSO PRESENT: VICKI MILLER WITH STATE FARM. PARTIES/COUNSEL STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT. *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THAT THE CASE HAS SETTLED PRIOR TO THE HEARING. JILL FERGUSON AS COURT REPORTER PARTIES STIPULATE TO WAIVE THE CLERK TAKING DOWN THE STIPULATION VERBATIM AND WILL RELY ON THE REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN VICKI MILLER IS DULY SWORN. SETTLEMENT REACHED AS FOLLOWS: IN EXCHANGE FOR A WAIVER OF COSTS, EACH PARTY WILL ASSUME THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES AND A DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE WILL BE FILED BY PLAINTIFF. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 04/13/2012 VACATED. JURY TRIAL ON 04/23/2012 VACATED. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 05/07/2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO PREPARE RELEASE AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES AS STATED ON THE ATTACHED DECLARATION OF MAILING. |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: T/E 4 DAYS CFM 4-13-12 / TD 4-23-12 |
|
March 19, 2012 | hearing |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY TREVOR M QUIRK COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. 03/23/12 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY TREVOR M QUIRK COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. 03/23/12 9:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 14. |
|
October 24, 2011 | hearing |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 14, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/13/2012 AT 1:00 P.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN. o OTHER: N/A YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 14, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/13/2012 AT 1:00 P.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN. o OTHER: N/A YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 14, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/13/2012 AT 1:00 P.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN. o OTHER: N/A YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE / FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / TRIAL o TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 14, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 4/13/2012 AT 1:00 P.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 4/23/2012 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P. CHAPIN. o OTHER: N/A YOUR ATTENTION IS DIRECTED TO THE ATTACHED SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES AND THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1380. DUTY OF ATTORNEYS AS TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE DIRECTED BY THE COURT FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, ALL PARTIES, THEIR ATTORNEYS AND, WHEN A PARTY IS INSURED, A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE INSURANCE COMPANY WHO HAS THE AUTHORITY TO SETTLE SUCH CASE, SHALL ATTEND THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
October 11, 2011 | hearing |
NP1430 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR TREVOR M QUIRK ON BEHALF OF JOAN MEREDITH (PL-1). ISMAEL MARAVILLA (DE-1) APPEARS BY LARRY F PEAKE ESQ. *************************************************************************************** TRIAL DATE SET: 04/23/2012 IN DEPARTMENT 4 AT 9:00 AM. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 04/13/2012 IN DEPARTMENT 4 AT 1:00 PM. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 03/23/2012 AT A TIME AND PLACE TO BE ANNOUNCED. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS. JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
October 11, 2011 | hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA Hearing Entered. |
|
October 11, 2011 | hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA Hearing Entered. |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: 4 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: HEATHER IJAMES MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR TREVOR M QUIRK ON BEHALF OF JOAN MEREDITH (PL-1). ISMAEL MARAVILLA (DE-1) APPEARS BY LARRY F PEAKE ESQ. *************************************************************************************** TRIAL DATE SET: 04/23/2012 IN DEPARTMENT 4 AT 9:00 AM. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 04/13/2012 IN DEPARTMENT 4 AT 1:00 PM. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 03/23/2012 AT A TIME AND PLACE TO BE ANNOUNCED. TIME ESTIMATE: 4 DAYS. JURY TRIAL REQUESTED BY ALL PARTIES. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
September 30, 2011 | hearing |
Case Management Statement FILED BY LARRY F PEAKE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. 10/11/11 8:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 4. |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement FILED BY LARRY F PEAKE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. 10/11/11 8:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 4. |
|
September 22, 2011 | hearing |
Case Management Statement FILED BY TREVOR QUIRK COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. 10/11/11 8:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 4. |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement FILED BY TREVOR QUIRK COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. 10/11/11 8:00AM IN DEPARTMENT 4. |
|
August 10, 2011 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Chapin, Sidney P. |
|
June 29, 2011 | hearing |
801M Pmt: First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 10/19/10 Amount of $395.00 for MARAVILLA, ISMAEL (DE-1). Received from LARRY F PEAKE APLC, check no(s) 1387. Receipt #598989 for amount of $395.00. |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
801M Pmt: First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 10/19/10 Amount of $395.00 for MARAVILLA, ISMAEL (DE-1). Received from LARRY F PEAKE APLC, check no(s) 1387. Receipt #598989 for amount of $395.00. |
|
June 28, 2011 | hearing |
Hearing Vacated ANSWER FILED ~ calid=1585160 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:08/10/2011, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:keishag, SystemDate:5/11/2011 4:52:44 PM |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated ANSWER FILED ~ calid=1585160 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:08/10/2011, Courtroom:4, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:SPC, Deputy:keishag, SystemDate:5/11/2011 4:52:44 PM |
|
June 24, 2011 | hearing |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY LARRY PEAKE |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY LARRY PEAKE |
|
June 21, 2011 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint WHAT SERVED:Summons;COMPLAINT;ADR PACKAGE;NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JDUGE;NOTICE OF CMC;NIOTICE OF OSC;STATEMENT OF DAMAGES WHO SERVED: ISMAEL MARAVILLA HOW SERVED:PERSONAL DATE SERVED:6/14/11 SERVICE FEES: $65.00 |
|
June 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint WHAT SERVED:Summons;COMPLAINT;ADR PACKAGE;NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JDUGE;NOTICE OF CMC;NIOTICE OF OSC;STATEMENT OF DAMAGES WHO SERVED: ISMAEL MARAVILLA HOW SERVED:PERSONAL DATE SERVED:6/14/11 SERVICE FEES: $65.00 |
|
May 11, 2011 | hearing |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin ON Oct 11, 2011 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin ON Oct 11, 2011 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. |
|
May 11, 2011 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 10, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 10, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin ON Oct 11, 2011 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE Sidney P Chapin ON Oct 11, 2011 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 10, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Aug 10, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. |
|
April 08, 2011 | hearing |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PL-1 |
|
April 08, 2011 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 432 |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 432 |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted PL-1 |
|
April 05, 2011 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
April 05, 2011 | hearing |
Complaint - Fast Track TREVOR M QUIRK, ESQ |
|
April 05, 2011 | hearing |
Request to Waive Court Fees PL-1 |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees PL-1 |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Fast Track TREVOR M QUIRK, ESQ |