Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMAYO VS COUNTY OF KERN MENTAL HEALTH SYSTEM OF CARE
A 08-Cv Civil Rights - Civil Unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Wallace, Arthur E presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 26, 2006
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Etienne, Linda;Category
08-CV Civil Rights - Civil Unlimited
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 8 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2007 | hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
June 26, 2007 | hearing |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON, DEPUTY |
|
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON, DEPUTY |
|
June 20, 2007 | hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO COMPLAINT. FILED BY LEVI REIBEN UKU, ESQ. |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO COMPLAINT. FILED BY LEVI REIBEN UKU, ESQ. |
|
May 22, 2007 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: Notice of Settlement OF ENTIRE CASE *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 6/29/2007. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 7/3/2007 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 6 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. TRIAL ON 5/29/2007 VACATED. |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: Notice of Settlement OF ENTIRE CASE *************************************************************************************** COUNSEL TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT AND FILE DISMISSAL BY 6/29/2007. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.1385 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ENTIRE MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE SET FOR 7/3/2007 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 6 UNLESS SOONER DISMISSED. TRIAL ON 5/29/2007 VACATED. |
|
May 18, 2007 | hearing |
Notice of Settlement-Rule 225 FAXED FILED BY LEVI REUBEN, ESQ OFFICIAL PMTS CONFIRMATION # 359017791 |
|
May 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement-Rule 225 FAXED FILED BY LEVI REUBEN, ESQ OFFICIAL PMTS CONFIRMATION # 359017791 |
|
May 16, 2007 | hearing |
Notice of Settlement-Rule 225 FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement-Rule 225 FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON |
|
May 11, 2007 | hearing |
Final Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON 5/18/07 3:30 P.M. D-6 |
|
May 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON 5/18/07 3:30 P.M. D-6 |
|
April 27, 2007 | hearing |
NP1440 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: OSAGIE F AMAYO (PL-1) APPEARS WITH LEVI REUBEN UKU. COUNTY OF KERN MENTAL HEALTH SYSTEM OF CARE (DE-1) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. GAIL LOPEZ (DE-2) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. *************************************************************************************** IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD. CASE NOT SETTLED. CONFIRMED FOR 6 DAY JURY TRIAL. |
|
April 27, 2007 | hearing |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
April 27, 2007 | hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TD 5-29-07//FCM 5-18-07 (D-6) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
4007 Mandatory Settlement Conference New Calendar |
|
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1440 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: OSAGIE F AMAYO (PL-1) APPEARS WITH LEVI REUBEN UKU. COUNTY OF KERN MENTAL HEALTH SYSTEM OF CARE (DE-1) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. GAIL LOPEZ (DE-2) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. *************************************************************************************** IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD. CASE NOT SETTLED. CONFIRMED FOR 6 DAY JURY TRIAL. |
|
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TD 5-29-07//FCM 5-18-07 (D-6) Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
April 24, 2007 | hearing |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY LEVI REUBEN UKU MSC: 4/27/07 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 6 |
|
April 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY LEVI REUBEN UKU MSC: 4/27/07 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 6 |
|
April 20, 2007 | hearing |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON MSC: 4/27/07 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 4 |
|
April 20, 2007 | hearing |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY LEVI REUBEN UKU MSC: 4/27/07 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 14 |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON MSC: 4/27/07 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 4 |
|
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement FILED BY LEVI REUBEN UKU MSC: 4/27/07 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPT 14 |
|
April 12, 2007 | hearing |
NP1820 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION: THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 4/27/2007 AT 10:00 A.M. DEPARTMENT 4 IS HEREBY RE-SET TO TAKE PLACE AT 11:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
NP1820 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION: THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 4/27/2007 AT 10:00 A.M. DEPARTMENT 4 IS HEREBY RE-SET TO TAKE PLACE AT 11:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. |
|
December 26, 2006 | hearing |
4024 Order to Appear New Calendar |
|
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
4024 Order to Appear New Calendar |
|
December 20, 2006 | hearing |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf o TIME ESTIMATE 6 DAY - JURY TRIAL. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 27, 2007 AT 10:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 18, 2007 AT 3:30 P.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 6, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE Arthur E Wallace (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON MAY 29, 2007 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 6, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE Arthur E Wallace. |
|
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf o TIME ESTIMATE 6 DAY - JURY TRIAL. o CAUSE SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 27, 2007 AT 10:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 4, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. o CAUSE SET FOR FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 18, 2007 AT 3:30 P.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT DEPARTMENT 6, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE Arthur E Wallace (see pretrial rules on next page). o CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON MAY 29, 2007 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SUPERIOR COURT, DEPARTMENT 6, 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301, BEFORE THE HONORABLE Arthur E Wallace. |
|
December 15, 2006 | hearing |
Sanctions Received $100.00 SANCTIONS PAID BY LEVI REUBEN UKU OTA SET FOR 12/26/06 IS OFF CALENDAR |
|
December 15, 2006 | hearing |
153 Pmt: Civil Sanctions CCP 128 & 128.5 Amount of $100.00 for AMAYO, OSAGIE F (PL-1). Received from OSAGIE F AMAYO. Receipt #284277 for amount of $100.00. |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
153 Pmt: Civil Sanctions CCP 128 & 128.5 Amount of $100.00 for AMAYO, OSAGIE F (PL-1). Received from OSAGIE F AMAYO. Receipt #284277 for amount of $100.00. |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Sanctions Received $100.00 SANCTIONS PAID BY LEVI REUBEN UKU OTA SET FOR 12/26/06 IS OFF CALENDAR |
|
December 13, 2006 | hearing |
NP1821 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: DECLARATION OF LEVI REUBEN UKU IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO APPEAR HEARING SET FOR 12/26/2006 *************************************************************************************** UPON PAYMENT OF $100.00 SANCTIONS, THE COURT WILL VACATE ORDER TO APPEAR ISSUED TO LEVI REUBEN UKU SET FOR 12/26/2006 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT6 |
|
December 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1821 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RULING ON: DECLARATION OF LEVI REUBEN UKU IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO APPEAR HEARING SET FOR 12/26/2006 *************************************************************************************** UPON PAYMENT OF $100.00 SANCTIONS, THE COURT WILL VACATE ORDER TO APPEAR ISSUED TO LEVI REUBEN UKU SET FOR 12/26/2006 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT6 |
|
December 11, 2006 | hearing |
Declaration LEVI REUBEN UKU'S DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 12/28/06 8:30 A.M. DEPT 6 |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration LEVI REUBEN UKU'S DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; 12/28/06 8:30 A.M. DEPT 6 |
|
December 06, 2006 | hearing |
Notice of Order to Appear TO: LEVI REUBEN UKU The hearing is set for DECEMBER 26, 2006 at 8:30 A.M. in DEPARTMENT 6 as a result of FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 12/4/2006. |
|
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Appear TO: LEVI REUBEN UKU The hearing is set for DECEMBER 26, 2006 at 8:30 A.M. in DEPARTMENT 6 as a result of FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 12/4/2006. |
|
December 04, 2006 | hearing |
NP1430 Department: 6 |
|
December 04, 2006 | hearing |
NP1835 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, LEVI REUBEN UKU. COUNTY OF KERN MENTAL HEALTH SYSTEM OF CARE (DE-1) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. GAIL LOPEZ (DE-2) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. *************************************************************************************** DEFENDANTS WAIVE JURY. JURY REQUESTED BY OSAGIE F AMAYO (PL-1). TRIAL DATE SET: 5/29/2007 IN DEPARTMENT 6 AT 9:00 A.M. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 5/18/2007 IN DEPARTMENT 6 AT 3:30 P.M. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 4/27/2007 AT 10:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 4. TIME ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS. DISCOVERY PURSUANT CODE. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. ORDER TO APPEAR TO ISSUE FOR LEVI REUBEN UKU FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE THIS DATE. SET ORDER TO APPEAR ON 12/26/2006 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 6. DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR THIS MINUTE ORDER AMENDED ON 12/15/2006 BY K. ENNIS TO CORRECT DATE FOR TRIAL. COPY OF AMENDED MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ATTORNEY LEVI REUBEN UKU. |
|
December 04, 2006 | hearing |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
December 04, 2006 | hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Wallace, Arthur E |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: 6 |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1835 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, LEVI REUBEN UKU. COUNTY OF KERN MENTAL HEALTH SYSTEM OF CARE (DE-1) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. GAIL LOPEZ (DE-2) APPEARS BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ESQ. *************************************************************************************** DEFENDANTS WAIVE JURY. JURY REQUESTED BY OSAGIE F AMAYO (PL-1). TRIAL DATE SET: 5/29/2007 IN DEPARTMENT 6 AT 9:00 A.M. FINAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 5/18/2007 IN DEPARTMENT 6 AT 3:30 P.M. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET: 4/27/2007 AT 10:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 4. TIME ESTIMATE: 6 DAYS. DISCOVERY PURSUANT CODE. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. ORDER TO APPEAR TO ISSUE FOR LEVI REUBEN UKU FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE THIS DATE. SET ORDER TO APPEAR ON 12/26/2006 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 6. DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR THIS MINUTE ORDER AMENDED ON 12/15/2006 BY K. ENNIS TO CORRECT DATE FOR TRIAL. COPY OF AMENDED MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ATTORNEY LEVI REUBEN UKU. |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
4148 Case Management Conference - NOA New Calendar |
|
November 27, 2006 | hearing |
Case Management Statement 12/04/06 @ 9:00AMJ, D-6 FILED BY LEVI RUEBEN UKU, ESQ |
|
November 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement 12/04/06 @ 9:00AMJ, D-6 FILED BY LEVI RUEBEN UKU, ESQ |
|
November 17, 2006 | hearing |
Case Management Statement 12/4/06 @ 8:00 AM., DEPT. 6 FILED BY B.C. BARMANN ST. , COUNTY COUNSEL |
|
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement 12/4/06 @ 8:00 AM., DEPT. 6 FILED BY B.C. BARMANN ST. , COUNTY COUNSEL |
|
August 21, 2006 | hearing |
Order to Show re: CRC Rule 201.7 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CRC RULE 201.7 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. *************************************************************************************** ORDER DISCHARGED. |
|
August 21, 2006 | hearing |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
|
August 21, 2006 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Wallace, Arthur E |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) New Calendar |
|
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show re: CRC Rule 201.7 Department: 6 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CRC RULE 201.7 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. *************************************************************************************** ORDER DISCHARGED. |
|
June 27, 2006 | hearing |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ON BEHALF OF DEFT #1 & 2 VIA AMS 6/28/06 |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint FILED BY JENNIFER L THURSTON ON BEHALF OF DEFT #1 & 2 VIA AMS 6/28/06 |
|
June 12, 2006 | hearing |
800G Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (1/1/06) Amount of $320.00 for AMAYO, OSAGIE F (PL-1). Received from LEVI REUBEN UKU, check no(s) 3286. Receipt #248413 for amount of $320.00. |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
800G Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (1/1/06) Amount of $320.00 for AMAYO, OSAGIE F (PL-1). Received from LEVI REUBEN UKU, check no(s) 3286. Receipt #248413 for amount of $320.00. |
|
June 05, 2006 | hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: LEVI REUBEN RE: Summons ON COMPLAINT ************************** Summons DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT Summons MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY |
|
June 05, 2006 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause 8/21/06 8:30 DEPT 6 |
|
June 05, 2006 | hearing |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES 12/4/06 8:00 DEPT 6 |
|
June 05, 2006 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 106 |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice TO: LEVI REUBEN RE: Summons ON COMPLAINT ************************** Summons DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT Summons MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice / Assign / Status / JES 12/4/06 8:00 DEPT 6 |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause 8/21/06 8:30 DEPT 6 |
|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 106 |
|
May 26, 2006 | hearing | Complaint - Fast Track |