Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WILLIAM M. MORRIS VS KATHY MARCO
A Small Claims - Conversion case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Alderete, Patrick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 08, 2000
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Judge
Category
Small Claims - Conversion
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2000 | hearing | Entered on PHOENIX by IS on 12-6-00 Case: WILLIAM M. MORRIS VS KATHY MARCO , CS-152140 Judge PMA not found: S, 1500, CS, 152140, WILLIAM M. MORRIS VS KATHY MARCO, I, SM, P, 11/08/2000, , 0, , 0, PMA, , , 12/10/2006 5:47:10 PM, , 33846, | |
December 06, 2000 | Docket Event | Entered on PHOENIX by IS on 12-6-00 Case: WILLIAM M. MORRIS VS KATHY MARCO , CS-152140 Judge PMA not found: S, 1500, CS, 152140, WILLIAM M. MORRIS VS KATHY MARCO, I, SM, P, 11/08/2000, , 0, , 0, PMA, , , 12/10/2006 5:47:10 PM, , 33846, | |
December 05, 2000 | hearing | Case DISPOSED in ENTIRETY. | |
December 05, 2000 | hearing | Case DISPOSED before TRIAL - DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
December 05, 2000 | hearing | Dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. | |
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event | Dismissed WITHOUT prejudice. | |
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event | Case DISPOSED in ENTIRETY. | |
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event | Case DISPOSED before TRIAL - DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
December 04, 2000 | hearing | Appearance DROPPED for 12/05/2000 at: 03:00 PM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA Drop reason: NO SERVICE | |
December 04, 2000 | Docket Event | Appearance DROPPED for 12/05/2000 at: 03:00 PM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA Drop reason: NO SERVICE | |
November 08, 2000 | hearing |
New Case Filed Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
November 08, 2000 | hearing | Hearing CONFIRMED for: 12/05/2000 at: 03:00 PM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA | |
November 08, 2000 | hearing | Receipt No. 181 , Amount Paid $ 35.00/NTM/IS . | |
November 08, 2000 | hearing | Case OPEN / ACTIVE. | |
November 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Receipt No. 181 , Amount Paid $ 35.00/NTM/IS . | |
November 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Case OPEN / ACTIVE. | |
November 08, 2000 | Docket Event |
New Case Filed Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
November 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Hearing CONFIRMED for: 12/05/2000 at: 03:00 PM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA |