Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CYNTHIA R. TOSTADO VS GEOFFREY B. VINES, JUDY VINES
A Small Claims - Conversion case was filed by Tostado Cynthia R, against Vines Judy, and Vines Geoffrey B, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Sharon Mettler presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 06, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 21, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
Small Claims - Conversion
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2009 | hearing |
Image of Archived Documents v |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Image of Archived Documents v |
|
December 07, 2000 | hearing | Entered on PHOENIX by JDJ on 12/07/00 | |
December 07, 2000 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to all parties. | |
December 07, 2000 | Docket Event | Entered on PHOENIX by JDJ on 12/07/00 | |
December 07, 2000 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to all parties. | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Heard by, S. METTLER Clerk, C. VELASQUEZ . | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Electronic Recording number(s) 570-684 | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Case DISPOSED by COURT TRIAL - AFTER EVIDENCE | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Judgment for DEFENDANTS against PLAINTIFF | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Exhibit list incorporated herein by reference. | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Matter argued and submitted. | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Evidence presented and submitted to court. | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | The following witness(es) GEOFFREY B. VINES, JUDY VINES, CHRISTY SHIPLEY, AND WILLIAM VINES sworn to testify on behalf of the DEFENDANTS | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | The following witness(es) CYNTHIA R. TOSTADO sworn to testify on behalf of the PLAINTIFF | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | DEFENDANTS, GEORFFREY B. VINES AND JUDY VINES, appeared in Pro Per. | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | PLAINTIFF, CYNTHIA R. TOSTADO appeared in Pro Per. | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Cause came on regularly for Small Claims Court Trial, before the Honorable, Sharon Mettler , in Division A | |
November 30, 2000 | hearing | Minute Ordered posted | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, CYNTHIA R. TOSTADO appeared in Pro Per. | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Heard by, S. METTLER Clerk, C. VELASQUEZ . | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Cause came on regularly for Small Claims Court Trial, before the Honorable, Sharon Mettler , in Division A | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Judgment for DEFENDANTS against PLAINTIFF | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Electronic Recording number(s) 570-684 | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | The following witness(es) GEOFFREY B. VINES, JUDY VINES, CHRISTY SHIPLEY, AND WILLIAM VINES sworn to testify on behalf of the DEFENDANTS | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Evidence presented and submitted to court. | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Case DISPOSED by COURT TRIAL - AFTER EVIDENCE | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Exhibit list incorporated herein by reference. | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | The following witness(es) CYNTHIA R. TOSTADO sworn to testify on behalf of the PLAINTIFF | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS, GEORFFREY B. VINES AND JUDY VINES, appeared in Pro Per. | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Minute Ordered posted | |
November 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Matter argued and submitted. | |
November 29, 2000 | hearing | Case REASSIGNED to JUDGE Pro Tem James R Hulsy | |
November 29, 2000 | Docket Event | Case REASSIGNED to JUDGE Pro Tem James R Hulsy | |
November 22, 2000 | hearing | Proof of Service filed, as to: GEOFFREY B. VINES, JUDY VINES, $30.00 FEE PAID/IS | |
November 22, 2000 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed, as to: GEOFFREY B. VINES, JUDY VINES, $30.00 FEE PAID/IS | |
November 17, 2000 | hearing | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ADDING ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT/IS | |
November 17, 2000 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ADDING ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT/IS | |
November 06, 2000 | hearing | Hearing CONFIRMED for: 11/30/2000 at: 03:00 PM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA | |
November 06, 2000 | Docket Event | Hearing CONFIRMED for: 11/30/2000 at: 03:00 PM for appearance type: SMCL in Division: TBA | |
November 02, 2000 | hearing |
New Case Filed Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
November 02, 2000 | hearing | Amount of prayer in complaint is $ $5000.00/IS | |
November 02, 2000 | hearing | Receipt No. 626 , Amount Paid $ 20.00/NH/IS . | |
November 02, 2000 | hearing | Case OPEN / ACTIVE. | |
November 02, 2000 | Docket Event | Amount of prayer in complaint is $ $5000.00/IS | |
November 02, 2000 | Docket Event | Receipt No. 626 , Amount Paid $ 20.00/NH/IS . | |
November 02, 2000 | Docket Event | Case OPEN / ACTIVE. | |
November 02, 2000 | Docket Event |
New Case Filed Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |