Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LITTREL VS TEMPLE
A 32-Cl <10k Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited case was filed by Littrel, Teresa, against Temple, Bennie, and Temple, Robbie, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 15, 2014
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
32-CL <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2015 | hearing |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 1/28/2015, in Department 12, before the Honorable [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME], pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 1/28/2015, in Department 12, before the Honorable Linda S Etienne, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ Linda S Etienne Judge of the Superior Court |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action (Full) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 1/28/2015, in Department 12, before the Honorable [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME], pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 1/28/2015, in Department 12, before the Honorable Linda S Etienne, pursuant to an Order to Appear for failure to comply with local rules made under the provision of the Trial Court Delay Reduction Act of 1986. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ Linda S Etienne Judge of the Superior Court |
|
January 28, 2015 | hearing |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(C). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
January 28, 2015 | hearing |
4191 Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15.1(c)) Hearing Entered. |
|
January 28, 2015 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
4191 Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15.1(c)) Hearing Entered. |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(C). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
November 13, 2014 | hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO BENNIE TEMPLE |
|
November 13, 2014 | hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO ROBBIE TEMPLE |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO BENNIE TEMPLE |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO ROBBIE TEMPLE |
|
November 03, 2014 | hearing |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Undelivered NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS |
|
October 24, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Service AS TO BENNIE TEMPLE |
|
October 24, 2014 | hearing |
Proof of Service AS TO ROBBIE TEMPLE |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AS TO BENNIE TEMPLE |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AS TO ROBBIE TEMPLE |
|
October 22, 2014 | hearing |
841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); Amount of $240.00 for LITTREL, TERESA (PL-1). Received from TERESA LITTRELL, check no(s) 201. Receipt #805646 for amount of $240.00. |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); Amount of $240.00 for LITTREL, TERESA (PL-1). Received from TERESA LITTRELL, check no(s) 201. Receipt #805646 for amount of $240.00. |
|
October 20, 2014 | hearing |
Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jan 28, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ Linda S Etienne Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jan 28, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ Linda S Etienne Judge of the Superior Court |
|
October 20, 2014 | hearing | NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. | |
October 20, 2014 | hearing |
Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property 1005 PALOMA ST., BAKERSFIELD, 93304 |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property 1005 PALOMA ST., BAKERSFIELD, 93304 |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jan 28, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ Linda S Etienne Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jan 28, 2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ Linda S Etienne Judge of the Superior Court |
|
October 15, 2014 | hearing |
Summons Issued and Filed Document Image |
|
October 15, 2014 | hearing |
Complaint - Unlawful Detainer IN PRO PER |
|
October 15, 2014 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) Document Image |
|
October 15, 2014 | hearing |
CONV New case created. |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) Document Image |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed Document Image |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Unlawful Detainer IN PRO PER |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created. |