Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE VS VILLATORO
A 09-Cl >10k <25k Other Collections-Civil Limited case was filed by Capital One Bank, represented by Hoffman, Martin, against Villatoro, Jose G., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. Judge Etienne, Linda S. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 17, 2008
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2021
Filing Location
Kern County, CA
Category
09-CL >10K <25K Other Collections-Civil Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 years, 7 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2015 | hearing | Image of Archived Documents | |
February 19, 2010 | hearing | Order Dismissing Action (Full) | |
February 04, 2010 | hearing |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE WAS FILED ON 11/17/08. NO SANCTIONS HAVE BEEN PAID AND NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF ON 11/3/09, 12/7/09 AND 2/4/10. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED PREJUDICE. |
|
February 04, 2010 | hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
February 04, 2010 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTC WITH 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** CASE WAS FILED ON 11/17/08. NO SANCTIONS HAVE BEEN PAID AND NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF ON 11/3/09, 12/7/09 AND 2/4/10. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: CASE DISMISSED PREJUDICE. |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTC WITH 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
February 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
December 21, 2009 | hearing | Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause | |
December 07, 2009 | hearing |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** NOTICE SENT WAS UNTIMELY. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS RE-DIRECTED TO SEND OUT A NEW NOTICE . THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE CRC 3.740. THE HEARING IS SET FOR FEBRUARY 4, 2010, AT 8:30 AM, IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM COURT. |
|
December 07, 2009 | hearing |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
December 07, 2009 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTC WITH CRC 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause AND OTA AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTC WITH CRC 3.740 Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP4170 AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL AND ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH RULE 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** NOTICE SENT WAS UNTIMELY. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS RE-DIRECTED TO SEND OUT A NEW NOTICE . THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CASE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE CRC 3.740. THE HEARING IS SET FOR FEBRUARY 4, 2010, AT 8:30 AM, IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM COURT. |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal New Calendar |
|
December 01, 2009 | hearing | Order to Appear and Order to Show Cause | |
November 03, 2009 | hearing |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO BE PAID BY /STAYED (30) DAYS (UNTIL 12/3/09) IF IN COMPLIANCE SANCTIONS WAIVED IF NOT DUE AND PAYABLE ON 12/4/09. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740. HEARING SET 12/7/2009 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
November 03, 2009 | hearing |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
November 03, 2009 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Etienne, Linda S. |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
4184 Order to Show Cause (CRC 3.740(f)) New Calendar |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
NP1511 Department: 14 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE AUTO NOTICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. *************************************************************************************** SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 TO BE PAID BY /STAYED (30) DAYS (UNTIL 12/3/09) IF IN COMPLIANCE SANCTIONS WAIVED IF NOT DUE AND PAYABLE ON 12/4/09. COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND AN ORDER TO APPEAR RE: SANCTIONS AS TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL, FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE(S) 3.740. HEARING SET 12/7/2009 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 14. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. |
|
June 04, 2009 | hearing |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
4183 Order to Show Cause - (N23d - CRC 3.740(d)) New Calendar |
|
December 13, 2008 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Vacated - Proof of Service Filed VACATED 06/04/09 HEARING |
|
December 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Vacated - Proof of Service Filed VACATED 06/04/09 HEARING |
|
December 10, 2008 | hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint WHO WAS SERVED: ON DEFENDANT, JOSE G. VILLATORO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE OF SERVICE: 12/07/08 |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint WHO WAS SERVED: ON DEFENDANT, JOSE G. VILLATORO HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE OF SERVICE: 12/07/08 |
|
November 18, 2008 | hearing |
843Q Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (1/1/06) Amount of $180.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). Received from MANN BRACKEN, check no(s) 101019. Receipt #423464 for amount of $180.00. |
|
November 18, 2008 | hearing |
Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) 11/3/09 8:30AM DEPT 14 |
|
November 18, 2008 | hearing |
Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) 6/4/09 8:30AM DEPT 14 |
|
November 18, 2008 | hearing |
CONV New case created by deputy: 643 |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) 6/4/09 8:30AM DEPT 14 |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
843Q Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (1/1/06) Amount of $180.00 for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (PL-1). Received from MANN BRACKEN, check no(s) 101019. Receipt #423464 for amount of $180.00. |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
CONV New case created by deputy: 643 |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) 11/3/09 8:30AM DEPT 14 |
|
November 17, 2008 | hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 17, 2008 | hearing |
Complaint MARTIN HOFFMANN ESQ |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Complaint MARTIN HOFFMANN ESQ |