Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In re: Rabelo family Trust 2006
On December 01, 2017 a civil case was filed by Rabelo, Rogelio, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Ruben Sundeen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2017
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Determine Property of Trust
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Trusts
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 |
Motion to Amend
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Granted |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Motion to Amend 06/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 201 | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | 3rd Amended Notice for Motion for Order Amending Order Filed |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail on 3rd Amended Notice of Motion for Order Amending Order Filed |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | 2nd Amended Notice for Motion for Order Amending Order Filed |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Motion to Amend 06/16/2020 10:30 AM D- 201 |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Motion to Amend 05/18/2020 10:30 AM D- 201 | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail - Notice, Motion for Order Amending Order & Memorandum of Points & Authorit |
|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED Notice and Petitioner's Motion for Order Amending Order Filed |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 201 date: 03/24/2020 time: 10:30 AM | |
February 19, 2020 |
Motion to Amend
Judge: Ruben Sundeen |
||
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend - Motion Rescheduled |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend 02/19/2020 10:30 AM D- 201 | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Filed for Petitioner |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Rogelio Rabelo - Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order |
|
June 01, 2018 |
Petition to Determine Property of Trust
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Trust Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Filed |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Tentative Pregrant - Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee..., 6/1/18 | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes re Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirming Trustee..., 6/1/1 |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Wooksun Hong Filed |
|
May 07, 2018 |
Petition to Determine Property of Trust
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Probate 06/01/2018 10:05 AM D- 201 | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Trust Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 05/11/2018 time: 10:05 AM | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 05/07/2018 time: 10:00 AM | |
May 04, 2018 |
Petition to Determine Property of Trust
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Trust Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Proposed Order |
|
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes re Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee..., 5/4/18 |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail (Amended) Filed |
|
April 02, 2018 |
Petition to Determine Property of Trust
Judge: Thomas M. Reardon |
||
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Trust Hearing Commenced and Continued |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Probate dept: 201 date: 05/04/2018 time: 10:05 AM | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Rogelio Rabelo |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Examiner's Notes re Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee..., 4/2/18 |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Petitioner Filed |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Errata To Petition Filed |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition to Determine Property of Trust Filed | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Probate 04/02/2018 10:00 AM D- 201 |