Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK VS SMITHBUDNA
A Collection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 17, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 23, 2021
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Collection CRC 3.740-Under $10,000 (Riverside)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | hearing |
HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C). Vacated |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
January 15, 2020 | hearing |
HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C). Vacated |
|
August 12, 2019 | hearing |
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE) Vacated |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DI. Not Applicable |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
CHANGE ATTORNEY ON CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FROM PATENAUDE & FELIX APC TO PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C. ON ALL COMPLAINTS. Not Applicable |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA FILED. Not Applicable |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200. Not Applicable |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 1/15/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. C1. |
|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JMT IS RESCHEDULED TO 08/12/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1 - CORONA (OTHER PETITIONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER, COLLECTIONS) Not Applicable |
|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 8/12/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1. Not Applicable |
|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 8/12/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11 - RESCHEDULED TO:. Not Applicable |
|
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RELOCATION AND REASSIGNMENT TO CORONA (OTHER PETITIONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER, COLLECTIONS), DEPARTMENT C1 FOR ALL PURPOSES |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 08/17/2018 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA AS TO SUZETTE SMITHBUDNA; MAILING DATE OF 09/17/18 FILED. Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION). |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF RE: NONMILITARY STATUS FILED Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE) Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 08/17/2018 OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA AND FILED. Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92505. Not Applicable |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 8/12/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11. |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
|