Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: Ranjot Skywalker
On September 27, 2021 an unlimited civil case was filed by Ranjot Singh Skywalker, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 27, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Unlimited Civil
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)
Date: Dec 10, 2021Decree Changing Name Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Dec 09, 2021Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner
Date: Sep 27, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: Sep 27, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ranjot Singh Skywalker
Date: Sep 27, 2021Petition for Change of Name Filed
Date: Sep 27, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) Minute Order |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 12/10/2021 Result Type to Held Event |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed by: Ranjot Singh Skywalker (Petitioner) As to: Ranjot Singh Skywalker (Petitioner) Service Costs Waived: No Document |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner Filing |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by Mail DSM002 |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ranjot Singh Skywalker Filing |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Waive Court Fees As to Ranjot Singh Skywalker Granted Ruling |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name Filed Filing |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Ranjot Singh Skywalker Filing |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Uncontested 12/10/2021 11:00 AM D- 17 ScheduleHearing |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Petition for Change of Name Filed: Result: Granted Result Date: 12/10/2021 Document |