Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Garcia VS McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc.
On September 10, 2021 an unlimited civil (other employment complaint case) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 05, 2023
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Other Employment
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Settlement
Overview
Causes of Action
23 IV. CAUSES OF ACTION
2. AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND/OR DOES: Failure
20 FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND/OR_ DOES:
5. AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND/OR DOES: Failure to
14 SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND/OR_ DOES:
20 SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND/OR DOES:
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Jan 17, 2023Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: Jan 17, 2023Case Management Statement Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: Jan 12, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Nov 15, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: Nov 15, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Aug 23, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: Aug 23, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: Jan 25, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Jan 25, 2022Order re: Initial Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: Jan 05, 2022Minute Order (Initial Case Management Order)
Date: Jan 05, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: Jan 05, 2022Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment)
Date: Jan 04, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: Nov 16, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: Nov 08, 2021Answer Filed by: McCollisters Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant)
Date: Oct 28, 2021Answer Filed by: McCollisters Global Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: Oct 28, 2021Answer Filed by: McCollisters Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: Oct 28, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment)
Date: Oct 26, 2021Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: Sep 24, 2021Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: Sep 10, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: Sep 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Arnold Garcia
Date: Sep 10, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Fairness Hearing | ||
February 28, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Stipulation and Order to Consolidate cases RG21112345 AND RG21112189;: Status Date changed from 02/21/2023 to 02/22/2023 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed Updated -- Stipulation and Order to Consolidate cases RG21112345 AND RG21112189;: Status Date changed from 02/21/2023 to 02/22/2023 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed Document |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Consolidate cases RG21112345 AND RG21112189; Filed and Received by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) Document |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/28/2023 03:00 PM Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/28/2023 03:00 PM Event |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 01/17/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference} Tentative Ruling |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) Document |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/17/2023 03:00 PM Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/17/2023 03:00 PM Event |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: David Mara, Esq (Attorney) Document |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Address for David Mara, Esq (Attorney) updated Party |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) Vacate Future Dates: No Document |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/15/2022 03:00 PM Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/15/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) Document |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Status Date changed from 10/04/2022 to 10/05/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Status Date changed from 10/04/2022 to 10/05/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed Document |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Result: Granted Result Date: 10/05/2022 Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Result: Granted Result Date: 10/05/2022 Document |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference Filed and Received by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/11/2022 03:00 PM Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/11/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
August 23, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Result: Granted Result Date: 08/18/2022 Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Result: Granted Result Date: 08/18/2022 Document |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Status Date changed from 08/17/2022 to 08/18/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Status Date changed from 08/17/2022 to 08/18/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed Document |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference Filed and Received by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/23/2022 03:00 PM Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/23/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
January 25, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Order re: Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment Filed by: Clerk As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Order re: Initial Case Management Order Filed by: Clerk As to: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff); McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant); McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Initial Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Initial Case Management Order) Minute Order (Initial Case Management Order) Minute Order |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 23 - Hon. Brad Seligman Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 23 - Hon. Brad SeligmanReason: Transfer for Reassignment Assignment |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment) Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment) Minute Order |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 updated: Result Date to 01/04/2022 Result Type to Held - Motion Granted Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 updated: Result Date to 01/04/2022 Result Type to Held - Motion Granted Event |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Complex Determination Hearing Complaint - Other Employment Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex Case |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/25/2022 03:00 PM Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/25/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Event scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Type changed from Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension) to Complex Determination Hearing Updated -- Event scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Type changed from Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension) to Complex Determination Hearing Event |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
November 16, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: Arnold Garcia (Plaintiff) Document |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/04/2022 03:00 PM Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/04/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by: McCollister's Auto Transport, LLC (Defendant) Document |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by: McCollister's Global Services, Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by: McCollister's Transportation Systems, Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment) Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment) Minute Order |
|
October 26, 2021 |
Judge: Complaint - Other Employment |
||
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 ScheduleHearing |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing 10/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 ScheduleHearing |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Determination Hearing 10/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint - Other Employment Filed Filing |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed Issue |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complex Designation Requested Filing |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Arnold Garcia Filing |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other Employment Filed |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complex Designation Requested | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Arnold Garcia |
|