Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gonzales VS Gonzales
On May 10, 2021 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
September 23, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Auto Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
September 22, 2021 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Delbert C. Gee |
||
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 01/21/2022 02:00 PM D- 514 | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
September 22, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative Case Management Order |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 09/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 514 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Auto Tort Filed |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rodolfo Gonzales |
|