Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Li VS Huang
On February 26, 2021 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 26, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 07, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Auto Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
July 23, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 17 | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement of Chengguang Li Filed |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | First Amended Complaint Filed |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 07/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 17 |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Auto Tort Filed |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chengguang Li |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|