Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Casarez VS JPMorgan Chase Bank
On July 01, 2021 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 01, 2021
Last Refreshed
March 03, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Other Employment
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 07/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 514 |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Other Employment Filed |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joe Casarez |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|