Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Boruta VS JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
On October 01, 2019 a civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2019
Last Refreshed
March 16, 2021
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Category
Other Real Property
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
September 16, 2020 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jeffrey Brand |
||
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to Case Management Conf Continuance dept: 22 date: 03/15/2021 time: 03:00 PM | |
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
May 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 09/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 | |
February 13, 2020 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jeffrey Brand |
||
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order Issued |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed |
|
December 13, 2019 |
Motion to Consolidate
Judge: Jeffrey Brand |
||
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Consolidate - Dropped |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Objection to Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal Filed for Quality Loan Service Corporation |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of of Quality's Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service -Notice of Quality's Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Quality's Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service via Facsimile Filed |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Mirek Boruta, Maria Boruta |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Order Shortening Time Denied |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Mirek Boruta, Maria Boruta |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to Quality Loan Service Corporation Filed |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Consolidate Hearing Confirmed for 12/13/2019 10:00 AM D- 22 | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Consolidate Filed for Plaintiff |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail Filed |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint As to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Initial Case Management Conference 02/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 22 |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Other Real Property Filed |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mirek Boruta |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed |
|